Rassieur v. Metlife Auto & Home Insurance Agency, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Robert Terry Rassieur
Defendant: Metlife Auto & Home Insurance Agency, Inc., Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company and Economy Premier Assurance Company
Case Number: 4:2021cv01269
Filed: October 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: David D Noce
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2021 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss :Plaintiff's Petition filed by Plaintiff Robert Terry Rassieur. (Appelbaum, Theresa)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution. This case is referred to: Mediation Designation of Lead Counsel: Theresa Appelbaum. (ADR Completion Deadline due by 4/1/2022. ADR Compliance Report Deadline due by 4/15/2022. Designation of Neutral/Conference Report due by 2/1/2022.) Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 12/8/2021. (AFO)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 2: Standard. [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS.] (Motion to Join Parties due by 2/1/2022. Discovery Completion due by 8/15/2022. Non-Dispositive Motions due by 8/26/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 8/30/2022. Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 10/14/2022 10:00 AM in Courtroom 17N - St. Louis before Magistrate Judge David D. Noce. Jury Trial set for 1/23/2023 09:00 AM in Courtroom 17N - St. Louis before Magistrate Judge David D. Noce. Pretrial Conference set for 1/17/2023 10:00 AM in Courtroom 17N - St. Louis before Magistrate Judge David D. Noce. Pretrial Compliance due by 1/13/2023.) Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 12/8/2021. (AFO)
December 8, 2021 Filing 21 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY (no pdf attached) for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David D. Noce:Rule 16 Conference held on 12/8/2021. Conference held by Zoom. CMO to issue. Motion Hearing held on 12/8/2021 re #7 MOTION to Dismiss :Plaintiff's Petition filed by Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Metlife Auto & Home Insurance Agency, Inc. The Court hears from the parties. The Court will give plaintiff's attorney 15 days to supplement their argument and defense 7 days after their filing to supplement their argument. (proceedings started: 1:34 PM) (proceedings ended: 1:52 PM) (Recorded on Zoom by: A.Ojolola)(Appearance for Plaintiff: Theresa Appelbaum)(Appearance for Defendant: Lucas Ude) (AFO)
December 3, 2021 Filing 20 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiff Robert Terry Rassieur. . (Appelbaum, Theresa)
November 18, 2021 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss :Plaintiff's Petition filed by Defendants Metlife Auto & Home Insurance Agency, Inc., Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Wolf, Timothy)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #17 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Law Firm of Record attorney/firm Gretchen Myers. ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 11/16/2021. (SMB)
November 15, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Law Firm of Record ;attorney/firm Gretchen Myers/ The Law Offices of Gretchen Myers, P.C. by Plaintiff Robert Terry Rassieur. (Myers, Gretchen)
November 11, 2021 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss :Plaintiff's Petition filed by Plaintiff Robert Terry Rassieur. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Metlife Policy)(Appelbaum, Theresa)
November 8, 2021 Filing 15 FULL CONSENT has been received by Defendants Economy Premier Assurance Company, Metlife Auto & Home Insurance Agency, Inc., Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Plaintiff Robert Terry Rassieur. (AFO)
November 8, 2021 Filing 14 ENTRY of Appearance by Theresa A. Appelbaum for Plaintiff Robert Terry Rassieur. (Appelbaum, Theresa)
November 5, 2021 Notice from Clerk instructing Defendants Metlife Auto & Home Insurance Agency, Inc., Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 11/12/2021. (KJS)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RULE 16 ORDER This case is assigned to Track: Track 2: Standard Joint Scheduling Plan due by 12/3/2021. Rule 16 Conference set for 12/8/2021 01:30 PM in Zoom Video Conference before Magistrate Judge David D. Noce. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 11/15/2021.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 11/1/21. (KJS)
October 29, 2021 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Economy Premier Assurance Company. Parent companies: EPAC is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Economy Fire & Casualty Company which is a wholly owned subsidiary of Metropoitan Property and Casualty Insuance Company, Subsidiaries: none, Publicly held company: none,. (Wolf, Timothy)
October 29, 2021 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Metlife Auto & Home Insurance Agency, Inc.. Parent companies: MetLife Auto & Home Insurance Agency, Inc.. (which now does business as Farmers General Insurance Agency, Inc.), Subsidiaries: none, Publicly held company: none,. (Wolf, Timothy)
October 29, 2021 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company. Parent companies: Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company (whose name has been changed in Missouri to Farmers Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Subsidiaries: none, Publicly held company: none,. (Wolf, Timothy)
October 29, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Economy Premier Assurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Part I, #2 Exhibit A - Part II)(Wolf, Timothy)
October 29, 2021 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss :Plaintiff's Petition filed by Defendants Metlife Auto & Home Insurance Agency, Inc., Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wolf, Timothy)
October 29, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss :Plaintiff's Petition by Defendants Metlife Auto & Home Insurance Agency, Inc., Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Wolf, Timothy)
October 22, 2021 Filing 6 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (Potter, Jacob)
October 22, 2021 Filing 5 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, St. Louis County Missouri, filed by Robert Terry Rassieur.(BAK)
October 22, 2021 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Lucas James Ude for Defendants Economy Premier Assurance Company, Metlife Auto & Home Insurance, Inc., Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Ude, Lucas)
October 22, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Economy Premier Assurance Company, Metlife Auto & Home Insurance, Inc., Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company Sent To: Plaintiff (Wolf, Timothy)
October 22, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Economy Premier Assurance Company, Metlife Auto & Home Insurance, Inc., Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company Sent To: State Court - Unexecuted (Wolf, Timothy) Modified on 10/22/2021 (BAK).
October 22, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis County, case number 21SL-CC04015, with receipt number AMOEDC-8935820, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Economy Premier Assurance Company, Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Metlife Auto & Home Insurance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C)(Wolf, Timothy)
October 22, 2021 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge David D. Noce. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). (BAK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rassieur v. Metlife Auto & Home Insurance Agency, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Terry Rassieur
Represented By: Gretchen Myers
Represented By: Theresa A. Appelbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metlife Auto & Home Insurance Agency, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy J. Wolf
Represented By: Lucas James Ude
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Lucas James Ude
Represented By: Timothy J. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Economy Premier Assurance Company
Represented By: Timothy J. Wolf
Represented By: Lucas James Ude
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?