Dawson v. Aspen American Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Amy Dawson
Defendant: Aspen American Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2021cv01363
Filed: November 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Clark
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to Counterclaim by Amy Dawson.(Knieriem, David)
December 15, 2021 Filing 10 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff Amy Dawson by Aspen American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Enrollment Form - Redacted)(Kenny, Patrick)
November 19, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Aspen American Insurance Company Sent To: State Court - Executed (Kenny, Patrick)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Docket Text ORDER: The Court grants #7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Petition by Defendant Aspen American Insurance Company. (Kenny, Patrick) (Aspen American Insurance Company answer due 12/15/2021.) Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 11/19/2021. (LNJ)
November 18, 2021 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Petition by Defendant Aspen American Insurance Company. (Kenny, Patrick)
November 17, 2021 Filing 6 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, St. Louis County Missouri, filed by Amy Dawson.(BAK)
November 17, 2021 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholas Anthony Cammarata for Defendant Aspen American Insurance Company. (Cammarata, Nicholas)
November 17, 2021 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Aspen American Insurance Company. Parent companies: Apollo Blobal Management, Inc., Subsidiaries: N/A, Publicly held company: N/A,. (Kenny, Patrick)
November 17, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Aspen American Insurance Company Sent To: Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Notice of Removal)(Kenny, Patrick)
November 17, 2021 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Patrick J. Kenny for Defendant Aspen American Insurance Company. (Kenny, Patrick)
November 17, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis County Circuit Court, case number 21SL-CC04759, with receipt number AMOEDC-8983206, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Aspen American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court File, #2 Exhibit B- State Court Docket, #3 Exhibit C- Correspondence, #4 Exhibit D- Notice to Plaintiff, #5 Exhibit E- Claims Status Report, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Original Filing Form)(Kenny, Patrick)
November 17, 2021 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Stephen R. Clark. (BAK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dawson v. Aspen American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Dawson
Represented By: David C. Knieriem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aspen American Insurance Company
Represented By: Nicholas Anthony Cammarata
Represented By: Patrick J. Kenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?