In re: In the Matter of Southern Towing Company, LLC
Plaintiff: Southern Towing Company, LLC
Case Number: 4:2021cv01369
Filed: November 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: John A Ross
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice David James. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-9065364) by Plaintiff Southern Towing Company, LLC. ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 1/10/2022. (CLO)
January 10, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice David James. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-9065364) by Plaintiff Southern Towing Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(James, David)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fredrick W. Mahley by Plaintiff Southern Towing Company, LLC. (Mahley, Frederick) ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 1/3/22. (JAB)
December 29, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fredrick W. Mahley (William Mahley). The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-9049544) by Plaintiff Southern Towing Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Mahley, Frederick)
December 8, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Complaint for Exoneration From, Or Limitation Of, Liability. Signed by Clerk of Court on December 8, 2021. (JAB)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER APPROVING SECURITY FOR VESSEL, DIRECTING ISSUANCE OF NOTICE, AND RESTRAINING SUITS: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that said Ad Interim Stipulation for Value with Letter of Undertaking (Doc. 3-1) be, and the same hereby is, APPROVED as Security for the Value of the motor vessel BAXTER SOUTHERN and its pending freight. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 12/8/21. (JAB)
December 8, 2021 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Southern Towing Company, LLC.. (Nienhuis, Robert)
December 6, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Relief Requesting Order Approving Security, Directing Issuance of Notice, and Restraining Suits Pursuant to Rule F by Plaintiff Southern Towing Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Ad Interim Stipulation for Value with Letter of Undertaking, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Notice of Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Proposed Order)(Nienhuis, Robert)
November 22, 2021 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Jacob D. Curtis for Plaintiff Southern Towing Company, LLC. (Curtis, Jacob)
November 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant No additional parties at this time with receipt number AMOEDC-8988437, in the amount of $402 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Southern Towing Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration of Value M/V Baxter, #2 Attachment Declaration of Pending Freight, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form)(Nienhuis, Robert)
November 19, 2021 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge John A. Ross. (BAK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: In the Matter of Southern Towing Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southern Towing Company, LLC
Represented By: Robert Nienhuis
Represented By: David Earl James
Represented By: Frederick William Mahley
Represented By: Jacob D. Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?