Lawson v. Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois
Plaintiff: Lisa Lawson
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois
Case Number: 4:2021cv01371
Filed: November 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Henry Edward Autrey
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2021 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Missouri Circuit Court filed by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Myers, Kevin)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution. This case is referred to: Mediation Designation of Lead Counsel: Daniel J. Emerson. Designation of Neutral/Conference Report due by 6/6/2022. ADR Completion Deadline due by 7/15/2022. ADR Compliance Report Deadline due by 7/29/2022. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 12/10/2021. (JEB)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (See Full Order) This case is assigned to Track: 2 Motion to Join Parties due by 1/25/2022. Discovery Completion due by 9/15/2022. Non-Dispositive Motions due by 9/26/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 10/3/2022. Pretrial Compliance due by 2/20/2023. Motion in Limine due by 2/20/2023. Jury Trial set for 3/6/2023 09:30 AM in Courtroom 10N - St. Louis before District Judge Henry Edward Autrey. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 12/10/2021. (JEB)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the scheduling conference pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 16 set for December 14, 2021, is vacated. The Case Management Order will be entered based on the dates provided by the parties in the Proposed Joint Scheduling Plan. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on December 8, 2021. (MCB)
December 7, 2021 Filing 11 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. . (Myers, Kevin)
December 7, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE Intent to Attend Rule 16 Conf: by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois (Myers, Kevin)
December 3, 2021 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #8 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Missouri Circuit Court filed by Plaintiff Lisa Lawson. (Emerson, Daniel)
December 3, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Missouri Circuit Court by Plaintiff Lisa Lawson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Lisa Lawson)(Emerson, Daniel)
November 29, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Continue Rule 16 Conference by Plaintiff Lisa Lawson. (Emerson, Daniel)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CONFERENCE (See Full Order) This case is assigned to Track: 2 Joint Scheduling Plan due by 12/7/2021. Rule 16 Conference set for 12/14/2021 10:00 AM in Telephone Conference in Chambers before District Judge Henry Edward Autrey. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 11/23/2021. (JEB)
November 22, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois.(Myers, Kevin)
November 19, 2021 Filing 4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, City of St Louis, filed by Lisa Lawson.(BAK)
November 19, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois Sent To: Plaintiff (Myers, Kevin)
November 19, 2021 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois.. (Myers, Kevin)
November 19, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis City Circuit Court, case number 2122-CC09542, with receipt number AMOEDC-8988829, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form , #3 Exhibit A)(Myers, Kevin)
November 19, 2021 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Henry E. Autrey. (BAK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lawson v. Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Lawson
Represented By: Daniel J. Emerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois
Represented By: Kevin E. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?