H&B Ventures, LLC et al v. State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: H&B Ventures, LLC and Gene Bentrup
Defendant: State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company and Hamza Daghamin
Case Number: 4:2021cv01385
Filed: November 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Jean C Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2021 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of City of St. Louis Plaintiff's Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Remand filed by Plaintiff Gene Bentrup. (O'Grady, Matthew) (Main Document 22 replaced on 12/28/2021) (KXS).
December 17, 2021 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of City of St. Louis filed by Defendant State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cockerham, Robert)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #16 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #15 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Counter Defendants Gene Bentrup, H&B Ventures, LLC, Plaintiffs Gene Bentrup, H&B Ventures, LLC. (O'Grady, Matthew) filed by Gene Bentrup, H&B Ventures, LLC ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 12/17/2021. (NEP)
December 16, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #16 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #15 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Counter Defendants Gene Bentrup, H&B Ventures, LLC, Plaintiffs Gene Bentrup, H&B Ventures, LLC. (O'Grady, Matthew)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Order Setting Rule 16 (Doc. No 17) is VACATED. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 12/16/2021. (NEP)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 VACATED per DTO 18 - RULE 16 ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 2 Joint Scheduling Plan due by 1/3/2022. Rule 16 Conference set for 1/11/2022 10:30 AM in Telephone Conference in Chambers before District Judge Jean C. Hamilton.. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 12/15/2021. (NEP) Modified on 12/16/2021 (NEP).
December 7, 2021 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #15 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Hamza Daghamin. (Hongs, John)
December 7, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Hamza Daghamin. (Hongs, John)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 Notice of Filing Motion to Consolidate, #4 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, #3 MOTION to Dismiss : Count II for Negligence/Defamation by Counter Defendants Gene Bentrup, H&B Ventures, LLC, Plaintiffs Gene Bentrup, H&B Ventures, LLC. (O'Grady, Matthew) filed by Gene Bentrup, H&B Ventures, LLC; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 12/7/2021. (KEK)
December 6, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 Notice of Filing Motion to Consolidate, #4 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, #3 MOTION to Dismiss :Count II for Negligence/Defamation by Counter Defendants Gene Bentrup, H&B Ventures, LLC, Plaintiffs Gene Bentrup, H&B Ventures, LLC. (O'Grady, Matthew)
December 6, 2021 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #11 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of City of St. Louis filed by Counter Defendants Gene Bentrup, H&B Ventures, LLC, Plaintiffs Gene Bentrup, H&B Ventures, LLC. (O'Grady, Matthew)
December 6, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of City of St. Louis by Counter Defendants Gene Bentrup, H&B Ventures, LLC, Plaintiffs Gene Bentrup, H&B Ventures, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Service)(O'Grady, Matthew)
November 30, 2021 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by John M. Hongs for Defendant Hamza Daghamin. (Hongs, John)
November 30, 2021 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Breanna Lynn Hunt for Plaintiff H&B Ventures, LLC. (Hunt, Breanna)
November 30, 2021 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Breanna Lynn Hunt for Plaintiff Gene Bentrup. (Hunt, Breanna)
November 23, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company Sent To: Plaintiff (JWD)
November 23, 2021 Filing 6 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis, filed by H&B Ventures, LLC, Gene Bentrup.(JWD)
November 23, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing of Motion to consolidated by Defendant State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company with case number 4:21-cv-01062 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Cockerham, Robert)
November 23, 2021 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #3 MOTION to Dismiss :Count II for Negligence/Defamation filed by Defendant State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Cockerham, Robert)
November 23, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss :Count II for Negligence/Defamation by Defendant State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Cockerham, Robert)
November 23, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint , AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff All Plaintiffs by State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Cockerham, Robert)
November 23, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis City Circuit Court, case number 2122-CC09713, with receipt number AMOEDC-8995014, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Form)(Cockerham, Robert)
November 23, 2021 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Jean C. Hamilton. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). (JWD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: H&B Ventures, LLC et al v. State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H&B Ventures, LLC
Represented By: Matthew P. O'Grady
Represented By: Breanna Lynn Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gene Bentrup
Represented By: Matthew P. O'Grady
Represented By: Breanna Lynn Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert W. Cockerham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hamza Daghamin
Represented By: John M. Hongs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?