Campbell v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Annlee Campbell
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2021cv01394
Filed: November 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Ronnie L White
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: This case is assigned to Track: 2 (Standard) [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS] (Motion to Join Parties due by 2/18/2022. Discovery Completion due by 11/11/2022. Non-Dispositive Motions due by 11/22/2022. ADR Future Reference 7/22/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 12/2/2022. Jury Trial set for 4/3/2023 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10S - St. Louis before District Judge Ronnie L. White. Pretrial Compliance due by 3/14/2023. Motion in Limine due by 3/14/2023.) Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 1/5/2022. (TMT)
January 5, 2022 Filing 11 First Amended ANSWER to Complaint by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Wilke, Daniel)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Rule 16 Telephone Conference previously scheduled for January 6, 2021, at 1:00 p.m., is CANCELED. The Court will issue a case management order based upon the parties' Joint Proposed Scheduling Plan. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on January 5, 2022. (JAU)
December 20, 2021 Filing 9 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. . (Wilke, James)
November 30, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company Sent To: State Court - Executed (Wilke, Daniel)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RULE 16 ORDER: This case is assigned to Track: Preliminary Track 2 (Standard) [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS] (Joint Scheduling Plan due by 12/16/2021. Rule 16 Conference set for 1/6/2022 01:00 PM in Telephone Conference in Chambers before District Judge Ronnie L. White.) Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 11/29/2021. (TMT)
November 29, 2021 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by James A. Wilke for Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Wilke, James)
November 29, 2021 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Wilke, Daniel)
November 29, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Wilke, Daniel)
November 29, 2021 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Daniel E. Wilke for Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Wilke, Daniel)
November 29, 2021 Filing 2 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court for St. Louis City, filed by Annlee Campbell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Policy Record)(JKL)
November 29, 2021 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Ronnie L. White. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). (JKL)
November 24, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from City of St. Louis, case number 2122-CC09724, with receipt number AMOEDC-8997972, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons, #4 Exhibit Plaintiff's Petition filed in State Court, #5 Exhibit State Court Pleadings, #6 Exhibit Notice to Attorney)(Wilke, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campbell v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annlee Campbell
Represented By: Matthew T. Nagel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Daniel E. Wilke
Represented By: James A. Wilke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?