Halliday v. Jensen et al
Plaintiff: Darian R Halliday
Defendant: Jeffrey Jensen and Gwendolyn Carroll
Case Number: 4:2021cv01397
Filed: November 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Sarah E Pitlyk
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2021 Filing 6 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Titled: Pro-Se Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. Received From: U.S. District Court, Western District of Missouri, filed by Darian R Halliday.(BAK)
November 29, 2021 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Missouri Western; Case Number 2:21-cv-04222. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case transferred in electronically.
November 29, 2021 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk. Per Local Rule 12.01, attorneys who are not admitted to the Eastern District of Missouri do not need to apply for admission pro hac vice in order to practice on a case if they had already filed an entry of appearance before the case was transferred from another United States District Court. For more information, visit #attorney applications. (BAK)
November 29, 2021 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (BAK)
November 29, 2021 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Mon Nov 29 12:02:02 CST 2021 (admin,)
November 29, 2021 Case electronically transferred to the Eastern District of Missouri. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Davies, Cindy)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: ORDERED that: (1) Defendants' motion to dismiss or, in the alternative, to transfer case (Doc. #2 ) is granted in the alternative; and (2) this case is transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri for all further proceedings. Signed on November 22, 2021 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Davies, Cindy)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ON PRETRIAL PROCEDURES. Signed on 11/19/2021 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Lock, Tania)
November 19, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to dismiss case for improper venue,or, in the alternative, to transfer the case to the Eastern District of Missouri filed by Jeffrey P. Ray on behalf of Gwendolyn Carroll, Jeffrey Jensen. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/3/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Ray, Jeffrey)
November 19, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Cole County, case number 21AC-CC00409, filed by Jeffrey P. Ray. Filing fee waived. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A [State court petition], #3 Exhibit B [State court docket])(Ray, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Halliday v. Jensen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darian R Halliday
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Jensen
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gwendolyn Carroll
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?