Cobb v. United Healthcare Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Michael Cobb
Defendant: United Healthcare Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2021cv01399
Filed: November 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Clark
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1362
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Docket Text ORDER: The Court received notice that the parties reached a settlement. The Court stays all pending deadlines. By no later than February 7, 2022, the parties must file a stipulation of dismissal, motion to dismiss, or consent judgment. Failure to timely comply with this order will result in the dismissal of this action with prejudice and without further notice. (Dismissal Paper(s) due by 2/7/2022.) Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 1/7/2022. (CBL)
January 7, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Settlement by Michael Cobb (Olszeski, Adam)
January 7, 2022 Filing 3 Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate to Defendant United Healthcare Insurance Company. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental organizational party must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within ten (10) days of the party's first pleading or entry of appearance. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible # (moed-0001.pdf). (KCD)
November 30, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Michael Cobb Process Server: Cole County Sheriff (BAK)
November 30, 2021 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Stephen R. Clark. 1 Summons(es) issued and emailed to Adam James Olszeski attorney. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). (BAK)
November 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant United Healthcare Insurance Company with receipt number AMOEDC-9000495, in the amount of $402 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Michael Cobb. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form, #3 Summons Summons, #4 Form Intent to Use Process Server)(Olszeski, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cobb v. United Healthcare Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Cobb
Represented By: Adam James Olszeski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Healthcare Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?