Neighbors Credit Union v. Integon National Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Neighbors Credit Union
Defendant: Integon National Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2021cv01477
Filed: December 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Patricia L Cohen
Referring Judge: Rodney W Sippel
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION to Continue Rule 16 Scheduling Conference by Defendant Integon National Insurance Company. (Cerulo, Michael)
February 10, 2022 Filing 12 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiff Neighbors Credit Union. . (Nowogrocki, James)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CONFERENCE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that:This case is assigned to Track: 2. Joint Scheduling Plan due by 2/11/2022. Rule 16 Conference set for 2/18/2022 10:00 AM in Telephone Conference in Chambers before District Judge Rodney W. Sippel. [SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS] Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 1/18/2022. (KEK)
January 4, 2022 Filing 10 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Rodney W. Sippel for all further proceedings. (KXS)
January 3, 2022 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Integon National Insurance Company. Parent companies: National General Management Corporation, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: National General Management Corporation,. (Cerulo, Michael)
January 3, 2022 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Neighbors Credit Union. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Hiotis, Stephen)
January 3, 2022 Filing 7 Electronic Notice of Noncompliance - Review of this case shows the Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate has not been filed by Defendant Integon National Insurance Company, Plaintiff Neighbors Credit Union. The certificate must be filed with the Court within 5 days # (moed-0001.pdf). Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 1/7/2022. (CBL)
January 3, 2022 Notice from Clerk instructing Defendant Integon National Insurance Company, Plaintiff Neighbors Credit Union to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 1/10/2022. (CBL)
December 30, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Integon National Insurance Company.(Cerulo, Michael)
December 16, 2021 Filing 5 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (Potter, Jacob)
December 16, 2021 Filing 4 First Amended Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis, filed by Neighbors Credit Union. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(JWD)
December 16, 2021 Filing 3 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis, filed by Neighbors Credit Union.(JWD) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/16/2021: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (JWD).
December 16, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Integon National Insurance Company Sent To: Plaintiff (JWD)
December 16, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court, City of St. Louis, case number 2122-CC09577, with receipt number AMOEDC-9033008, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Integon National Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form, #3 Exhibit A-State Court File, #4 Exhibit B-Notice to Plaintiff, #5 Exhibit C-Notice to State Court - Unexecuted)(Cerulo, Michael) Modified on 12/16/2021 to reflect the attached Notice to State Court is unexecuted (JWD).
December 16, 2021 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Patricia L. Cohen. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). (JWD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neighbors Credit Union v. Integon National Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neighbors Credit Union
Represented By: James G. Nowogrocki
Represented By: Stephen C. Hiotis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Integon National Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael D. Cerulo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?