Filius v. Missouri Department of Corrections
Plaintiff: Michael Filius
Defendant: Missouri Department of Corrections
Case Number: 4:2021cv01483
Filed: December 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Audrey G Fleissig
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2617
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2022 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendants Reply Memorandum in Support of its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Petition filed by Defendant Missouri Department of Corrections. (Krispin, Eileen)
January 10, 2022 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff Michael Filius. (Hackney, Jeffrey)
December 29, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE Confirmationn: by Defendant Missouri Department of Corrections (Attachments: #1 Attachment Confirmation of Notice of Removal)(Krispin, Eileen)
December 27, 2021 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Missouri Department of Corrections. (Krispin, Eileen)
December 27, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Missouri Department of Corrections. (Krispin, Eileen)
December 17, 2021 Receipt 4644097545 in the amount of $402.00 for CIVIL FILING FEE on behalf of MIssouri Department of Corr (CCAM)
December 17, 2021 Filing 4 First Amended Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, City of St Louis, filed by Michael Filius.(BAK)
December 17, 2021 Filing 3 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, City of St Louis, filed by Michael Filius.(BAK)
December 17, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Defendant Missouri Department of Corrections sent to: Plaintiff (Krispin, Eileen) Modified on 12/17/2021 (BAK).
December 17, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of St. Louis City, case number 2122-CC08667, in the amount of $402 receipt number 4644097545 Jury Demand,, filed by Missouri Department of Corrections. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court File, #2 Exhibit B-State Court Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit C- Original Filing Form, #4 Exhibit D- Civil Cover Sheet)(Krispin, Eileen)
December 17, 2021 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig. (BAK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Filius v. Missouri Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Filius
Represented By: Jeffrey David Hackney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Missouri Department of Corrections
Represented By: Eileen Ruppe Krispin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?