Gayfield v. USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Lamar Gayfield
Defendant: USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2021cv01509
Filed: December 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Audrey G Fleissig
Referring Judge: Matthew T Schelp
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RESCHEDULING RULE 16 CONFERENCE - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for continuance with consent is GRANTED. ECF No. #10 . the Rule 16 conference is RESCHEDULED for March 11, 2022, at 11:30 AM by Zoom. The Zoom log information remains the same. Except as set forth above, the previously entered Order Setting Rule 16 Conference shall remain in effect.( Rule 16 Conference set for 3/11/2022 11:30 AM in Zoom Video Conference before District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig.) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 2/7/2022. (JMP)
February 3, 2022 Filing 11 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiff Lamar Gayfield. . (Wilbers, John)
February 3, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION to Continue Rule 16 Conference by Plaintiff Lamar Gayfield. (Wilbers, John)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CONFERENCE - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: [SEE FULL ORDER FOR DETAILS.] Joint Scheduling Plan due by 2/22/2022. Rule 16 Conference set for 3/1/2022 01:00 PM in Zoom Video Conference before District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig.. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 1/31/2022. (JMP)
January 3, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant USAA Casualty Insurance Company Sent To: State Court - Executed (Wulff, Robert)
January 3, 2022 Filing 7 REASSIGNMENT ORDER (GJL). To avoid any potential appearance of impropriety, Judge Matthew T. Schelp disqualifies himself from this case. Therefore, the case is being randomly reassigned to a different Judge. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above styled cause is randomly reassigned to the Honorable Audrey G. Fleissig. (KXS)
December 29, 2021 Filing 6 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, City of St Louis, filed by Lamar Gayfield.(BAK)
December 29, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by USAA Casualty Insurance Company.(Wulff, Robert)
December 29, 2021 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert J. Wulff for Defendant USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Wulff, Robert)
December 29, 2021 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant USAA Casualty Insurance Company. Parent companies: United Services Automobile Association, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Wulff, Robert)
December 29, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant USAA Casualty Insurance Company Sent To: Plaintiff (Wulff, Robert)
December 29, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from City of St. Louis, Missouri, case number 2122-CC09768, with receipt number AMOEDC-9049266, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #3 Attachment State Court File)(Wulff, Robert)
December 29, 2021 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Matthew T. Schelp. (BAK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gayfield v. USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lamar Gayfield
Represented By: John L.B. Wilbers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert J. Wulff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?