Spates v. Buckner et al
Petitioner: Christopher Spates
Respondent: Warden Michelle Buckner, Eric Schmitt and Michelle Buckner
Case Number: 4:2022cv00011
Filed: January 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Matthew T Schelp
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2022 Filing 4 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Respondent Michelle Buckner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Pre-Trial Transcript, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B-1 - Trial Transcript, Vol 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B-2 - Trial Transcript, Vol 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B-3 - Trial Transcript, Vol 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C - Sentencing Transcript, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D - PCR Transcript, #7 Exhibit Exhibit E - DA Appellant's Brief, #8 Exhibit Exhibit F - DA Respondent's Brief, #9 Exhibit Exhibit G - DA Memorandum, #10 Exhibit Exhibit H - DA Order, #11 Exhibit Exhibit I - DA Mandate, #12 Exhibit Exhibit J - PCR Appellant's Brief, #13 Exhibit Exhibit K - PCR Respondent's Brief, #14 Exhibit Exhibit L - PCR Memo Supplementing Order, #15 Exhibit Exhibit M - PCR Mandate)(Kweskin, Benjamin)
February 4, 2022 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Benjamin Jared Kweskin for Respondent Michelle Buckner. (Kweskin, Benjamin)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 4. Show Cause Response due by 3/4/2022. Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 1/18/2022. (KXS)
January 5, 2022 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Matthew T. Schelp. (BAK)
January 4, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number AMOEDC-9057287.) by Petitioner Christopher Spates. (Gross, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spates v. Buckner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Christopher Spates
Represented By: Michael A. Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Michelle Buckner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Eric Schmitt
Represented By: Office of Missouri Attorney General - Habeas Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michelle Buckner
Represented By: Benjamin Jared Kweskin
Represented By: Office of Missouri Attorney General - Habeas Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?