El v. Woosley
Petitioner: Nizza P. El
Respondent: Jason Woolsey and Jason Woosley
Case Number: 4:2022cv00018
Filed: January 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Noelle C Collins
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2022 Filing 8 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Nizza P. El. Returned document(s): #3 Memorandum & Order, #4 Order of Dismissal (case - Stipulation of Dismissal). New address given to CMC and clerk resent document. (Document resent to Plaintiff at USP Marion.) (BRP)
February 1, 2022 Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable (Return to Sender). Mail sent to Nizza El. Returned document(s): Complaint Letter Created. Could not verify new address and mail was not resent. (TMT)
January 26, 2022 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Nizza P. El. Returned document(s): #5 Letter re:FRAP. Could not verify new address and mail was not resent. (KCD)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 5. Mon Jan 10 10:28:49 CST 2022 (Davis, Kinica)
January 7, 2022 Filing 5 Letter from Clerk sent to pro-se prisoner re:FRAP - all procedures for filing Notice of Appeal (copy of motion to proceed IFP on appeal attached and mailed) (KCD)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice for lack of proper venue. IT IS HEREBY CERTIFIED that an appeal from this order of dismissal would not be taken in good faith. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 01/07/2022. (KCD)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice for lack of proper venue. See 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). A separate Order of Dismissal will be entered herewith. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that an appeal from this dismissal would not be taken in good faith. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 01/07/2022. (KCD)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 3,4. Fri Jan 7 15:48:08 CST 2022 (Davis, Kinica)
January 6, 2022 Filing 2 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (Potter, Jacob)
January 6, 2022 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. (BAK)
January 6, 2022 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (BAK)
January 6, 2022 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Thu Jan 6 11:02:25 CST 2022 (admin,)
January 5, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Jason Woolsey Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Nizza P. El. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent, #2 Envelope)(BAK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: El v. Woosley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Nizza P. El
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jason Woolsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jason Woosley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?