Rozier v. Blair
Petitioner: Steven Rozier
Respondent: Paul Blair
Case Number: 4:2022cv00022
Filed: January 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Patricia L Cohen
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2022 Filing 7 Letter from Clerk sent to Petitioner Steven Rozier re: Failure to file Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 3/1/2022. (CBL)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 7. Magistrate consent letter sent to party not electronically notified this date. Thu Feb 24 12:37:53 CST 2022 (Long, Carol)
February 18, 2022 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Andrew Clarke for Respondent Paul Blair. (Clarke, Andrew)
February 10, 2022 Filing 5 Letter from Clerk sent to Petitioner Steven Rozier re: Failure to file Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 2/17/2022) (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction) (JAB)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 5. Mailed to party not set-up for electronic notification Thu Feb 10 09:19:09 CST 2022 (Bernsen, John)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following provisions apply in this case, and will be modified only upon a showing of exceptional circumstances: This case has been randomly assigned to a United States Magistrate Judge. The parties have twenty-one (21) days from their entry of appearance to file their Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction forms. Respondent must show cause, in writing and within forty-five (45) days of the date of this order, why the relief requested in the instant petition should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 2/9/22. (JAB)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 4. Mailed to party not set-up for electronic notification Wed Feb 9 16:23:12 CST 2022 (Bernsen, John)
February 7, 2022 Receipt 4644098301 in the amount of $5.00 for WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS on behalf of Steven Rozier (CCAM)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. Petitioner has filed a Petition Under 28 U.S.C. 2254 for Writ of Habeas Corpus, but has neither paid the filing fee nor filed a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, petitioner must either pay the $5.00 filing fee, or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall mail to petitioner a copy of the Court's form Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis and Affidavit in Support Habeas Cases. Response to Court due by 2/6/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 1/7/2022. (Attachments: #1 Motion for IFP Form - Habeas)(CBL)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 3. Order and IFP form sent to party not electronically notified this date. Fri Jan 7 11:01:17 CST 2022 (Long, Carol)
January 6, 2022 Filing 2 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (Potter, Jacob)
January 6, 2022 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Patricia L. Cohen. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. (JWD)
January 6, 2022 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (JWD)
January 6, 2022 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Thu Jan 6 15:00:55 CST 2022 (admin,)
January 5, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Petitioner Steven Rozier. (Attachments: #1 Original Filing Form, #2 Envelope)(JWD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rozier v. Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Steven Rozier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Paul Blair
Represented By: Office of Missouri Attorney General - Habeas Division
Represented By: Andrew Clarke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?