Stevenson v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Jennifer Stevenson
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 4:2022cv00049
Filed: January 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Ronnie L White
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2022 Filing 8 CERTIFIED Social Security Transcript Notice of Filing by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi (Attachments: #1 Transcript 1 - Certification, #2 Transcript 2 - Index, #3 Transcript 3 - pp. 1-124, #4 Transcript 4 - pp. 125-157, #5 Transcript 5 - pp. 158-280, #6 Transcript 6 - pp. 281-311, #7 Transcript 7 - pp. 312-398, #8 Transcript 8 - pp. 399-477)(Llewellyn, Nicholas)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: This case is assigned to Track: 4 (Administrative). Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on January 14, 2022. (BRP)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [ECF No. #3 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall electronically serve the complaint upon the Social Security Administration pursuant to this Court's Administrative Order In re: Service in Civil Actions Under the Social Security Act issued on September 10, 2021. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on January 14, 2022. (BRP)
January 13, 2022 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholas P. Llewellyn for Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Llewellyn, Nicholas)
January 13, 2022 Filing 4 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - CJA 23 by Plaintiff Jennifer Stevenson. (BAK)
January 13, 2022 Filing 3 SOCIAL SECURITY IDENTIFICATION FORM as to Plaintiff Jennifer Stevenson. (Van Fossan, Jennifer)
January 13, 2022 Filing 2 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Jennifer Stevenson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit CJA 23)(Van Fossan, Jennifer)
January 13, 2022 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT Non-Jury Demand,Yes or No - Yes,, filed by Jennifer Stevenson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form)(Van Fossan, Jennifer)
January 13, 2022 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Ronnie L. White. Administrative Transcript Due 3/14/2022 (BAK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stevenson v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Stevenson
Represented By: Jennifer M. Van Fossan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Nicholas P. Llewellyn
Represented By: USAO SSA Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?