Eder v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Noelle A. Eder
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 4:2022cv00064
Filed: January 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Sarah E Pitlyk
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWW)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2022 Filing 7 CERTIFIED Social Security Transcript Notice of Filing by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi (Attachments: #1 Transcript 1, #2 Transcript 2, #3 Transcript 3, #4 Transcript 4, #5 Transcript 5, #6 Transcript 6, #7 Transcript 7, #8 Transcript 8, #9 Transcript 9, #10 Transcript 10, #11 Transcript 11, #12 Transcript 12, #13 Transcript 13, #14 Transcript 14, #15 Transcript 15)(Blank, Shane)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following provisions apply in this case, and will be modified only upon a showing of exceptional circumstances: This case has been assigned to Track 4 (Administrative). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant is granted leave to file the transcript of the record under seal. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 02/15/2022. (KRZ)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis ECF No. #3 is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall electronically serve the complaint upon the Social Security Administration pursuant to this Court's Administrative Order In re: Service in Civil Actions Under the Social Security Act issued on September 10, 2021. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 02/15/2022. (KRZ)
January 20, 2022 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Shane Kyle Blank for Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Blank, Shane)
January 18, 2022 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Sarah E. Pitlyk. Administrative Transcript Due 3/21/2022 (JKL)
January 14, 2022 Filing 3 SOCIAL SECURITY IDENTIFICATION FORM filed by Noelle A. Eder.(Drury, David) Modified on 1/14/2022 (JWD). [Attorney filing error: Attorney used the wrong filing event. Docket entry corrected.]
January 14, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Noelle A. Eder.(Drury, David) Modified on 1/14/2022 (JWD). [Attorney filing error: Attorney used the wrong filing event. Docket entry corrected.]
January 14, 2022 Filing 1 First Social Security COMPLAINT Non-Jury Demand,Yes or No - Yes,, filed by Noelle A. Eder. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet, #2 Original Filing Form original filing form)(Drury, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eder v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noelle A. Eder
Represented By: David C. Drury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Shane Kyle Blank
Represented By: USAO SSA Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?