Wegleitner v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Kimber Wegleitner
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 4:2022cv00067
Filed: January 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Rodney W Sippel
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 402 Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (Social Security) by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Llewellyn, Nicholas) filed by Kilolo Kijakazi; ORDERED GRANTED Kilolo Kijakazi answer due 5/20/2022. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 3/18/2022. (KEK)
March 17, 2022 Filing 8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (Social Security) by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Llewellyn, Nicholas)
January 20, 2022 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholas P. Llewellyn for Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Llewellyn, Nicholas)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - TRACK 4: SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following provisions apply in this case, and will be modified only upon a showing of exceptional circumstances: This case is assigned to Track: 4. [SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS] Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 1/19/2022. (KEK)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [ECF No. #3 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall electronically serve the complaint upon the Social Security Administration pursuant to this Court's Administrative Order In re: Service in Civil Actions Under the Social Security Act issued on September 10, 2021. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 1/19/2022. (KEK)
January 18, 2022 Filing 4 SOCIAL SECURITY IDENTIFICATION FORM as to Plaintiff Kimber Minette Wegleitner. (Williams, Franklin)
January 18, 2022 Filing 3 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - CJA 23 by Plaintiff Kimber Minette Wegleitner. (Williams, Franklin)
January 18, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Kimber Minette Wegleitner. (Williams, Franklin)
January 18, 2022 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT Non-Jury Demand,Yes or No - Yes,, filed by Kimber Minette Wegleitner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover, #2 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form)(Williams, Franklin)
January 18, 2022 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Rodney W. Sippel. Administrative Transcript Due 3/21/2022 (BAK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wegleitner v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimber Wegleitner
Represented By: Franklin A. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: USAO SSA Division
Represented By: Nicholas P. Llewellyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?