Moss v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Barbara Moss
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 4:2022cv00141
Filed: February 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: John M Bodenhausen
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2022 Filing 7 CERTIFIED Social Security Transcript Notice of Filing by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi (Attachments: #1 Transcript 1, #2 Transcript 2, #3 Transcript 3, #4 Transcript 4, #5 Transcript 5, #6 Transcript 6, #7 Transcript 7, #8 Transcript 8, #9 Transcript 9, #10 Transcript 10, #11 Transcript 11, #12 Transcript 12, #13 Transcript 13)(Llewellyn, Nicholas)
February 8, 2022 Filing 6 FULL CONSENT has been received by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi and Plaintiff Barbara Moss. (KRZ)
February 8, 2022 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholas P. Llewellyn for Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Llewellyn, Nicholas)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following provisions apply in this case, and will be modified only upon a showing of exceptional circumstances: This case is assigned to Track: 4. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant is granted leave to file the transcript of the record under seal. (see full order for details.) Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen on 02/08/2022. (KRZ)
February 7, 2022 Filing 3 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (Potter, Jacob)
February 7, 2022 Filing 2 SOCIAL SECURITY IDENTIFICATION FORM as to Plaintiff Barbara Moss. (Young, Kelsey)
February 7, 2022 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT with receipt number AMOEDC-9112084, in the amount of $402 Non-Jury Demand,Yes or No - No,, filed by Barbara Moss. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form)(Young, Kelsey)
February 7, 2022 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Administrative Transcript Due 4/8/2022 (BAK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moss v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Moss
Represented By: Kelsey Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: USAO SSA Division
Represented By: Nicholas P. Llewellyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?