Nevels v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Miranda Nevels
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 4:2022cv00142
Filed: February 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: John A Ross
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2022 Filing 7 CERTIFIED Social Security Transcript Notice of Filing by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi (Attachments: #1 Transcript 1, #2 Transcript 2, #3 Transcript 3, #4 Transcript 4, #5 Transcript 5, #6 Transcript 6, #7 Transcript 7, #8 Transcript 8, #9 Transcript 9, #10 Transcript 10, #11 Transcript 11, #12 Transcript 12, #13 Transcript 13, #14 Transcript 14, #15 Transcript 15, #16 Transcript 16, #17 Transcript 17, #18 Transcript 18, #19 Transcript 19, #20 Transcript 20, #21 Transcript 21, #22 Transcript 22, #23 Transcript 23, #24 Transcript 24, #25 Transcript 25, #26 Transcript 26, #27 Transcript 27, #28 Transcript 28, #29 Transcript 29, #30 Transcript 30, #31 Transcript 31, #32 Transcript 32, #33 Transcript 33, #34 Transcript 34, #35 Transcript 35, #36 Transcript 36, #37 Transcript37, #38 Transcript 38, #39 Transcript 39, #40 Transcript 40, #41 Transcript 41, #42 Transcript 42, #43 Transcript 43, #44 Transcript 44, #45 Transcript 45, #46 Transcript 46, #47 Transcript 47, #48 Transcript 48, #49 Transcript 49, #50 Transcript 50, #51 Transcript 51, #52 Transcript 52, #53 Transcript 53, #54 Transcript 54, #55 Transcript 55, #56 Transcript 56, #57 Transcript 57)(Llewellyn, Nicholas)
February 8, 2022 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholas P. Llewellyn for Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Llewellyn, Nicholas)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. (See Full Order.) This case is assigned to Track: 4 - Administrative. Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(a)(3) and (4) and this Court's Administrative Order entered on September 10, 2021, within sixty (60) days of service of plaintiff's complaint, defendant must file a motion to dismiss, motion to remand, and/or certified administrative record which will be deemed an answer (general denial) to plaintiff's complaint. The certified administrative transcript is exempt from any redaction requirements and is to be filed in accordance with 42 U.S.C. 405(g). Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 2/7/2022. (CBL)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [ECF No. #3 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall electronically serve the complaint upon the Social Security Administration pursuant to this Court's Administrative Order In re: Service in Civil Actions Under the Social Security Act issued on September 10, 2021. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 2/7/2022. (CBL) Modified signature date on 2/8/2022 (CLO).
February 7, 2022 Filing 3 SOCIAL SECURITY IDENTIFICATION FORM as to Plaintiff Miranda Nevels. (Van Fossan, Kristen)
February 7, 2022 Filing 2 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Miranda Nevels. (Van Fossan, Kristen)
February 7, 2022 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT Non-Jury Demand,Yes or No - Yes,, filed by Miranda Nevels. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form)(Van Fossan, Kristen)
February 7, 2022 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable John A. Ross. Administrative Transcript Due 4/8/2022 (JKL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nevels v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miranda Nevels
Represented By: Kristen N. Van Fossan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: USAO SSA Division
Represented By: Nicholas P. Llewellyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?