Gabbard v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Shawn L. Gabbard
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 4:2022cv00156
Filed: February 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: John M Bodenhausen
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 416 Denial of Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2022 Filing 10 CERTIFIED Social Security Transcript Notice of Filing by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi (Attachments: #1 Transcript 1, #2 Transcript 2, #3 Transcript 3, #4 Transcript 4, #5 Transcript 5, #6 Transcript 6, #7 Transcript 7, #8 Transcript 8)(Blank, Shane)
February 9, 2022 Filing 9 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (Potter, Jacob)
February 9, 2022 Filing 8 FULL CONSENT has been received by Plaintiff Shawn L. Gabbard, Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (ANP)
February 9, 2022 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Shane Kyle Blank for Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Blank, Shane)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 4 IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant is granted leave to file the transcript of the record under seal.Pursuant to E.D.Mo.L.R. 9.02, plaintiff must, unless otherwise ordered by the Court, serve and file a brief within thirty (30) days after the Commissioner's service of the certified administrative transcript. (see full order for details.) Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen on 02/09/2022. (KRZ)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis ECF No. #3 is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall electronically serve the complaint upon the Social Security Administration pursuant to this Court's Administrative Order In re: Service in Civil Actions Under the Social Security Act issued on September 10, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen on 02/09/2022. (KRZ)
February 9, 2022 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable John M. Bodenhausen. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Administrative Transcript Due 4/11/2022 (JKL)
February 8, 2022 Filing 4 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - CJA 23 by Plaintiff Shawn L. Gabbard. (Camp, David)
February 8, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Shawn L. Gabbard. (Camp, David)
February 8, 2022 Filing 2 SOCIAL SECURITY IDENTIFICATION FORM as to Plaintiff Shawn L. Gabbard. (Camp, David)
February 8, 2022 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT Non-Jury Demand,Yes or No - Yes,, filed by Shawn L. Gabbard. (Attachments: #1 Original Filing Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Camp, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gabbard v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn L. Gabbard
Represented By: David D. Camp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Shane Kyle Blank
Represented By: USAO SSA Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?