Bratton v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Keith Bratton
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 4:2022cv00165
Filed: February 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Patricia L Cohen
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's motion to remand [ECF No. #10 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the decision of the Commissioner is REMANDED pursuant to sentence six of 42 U.S.C. 405(g) for further administrative proceedings regarding Plaintiff's claim. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 3/28/22. (JAB)
March 17, 2022 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION to Remand Case to Social Security Administration filed by Plaintiff Keith Bratton. (Van Fossan, Kristen)
March 17, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand Case to Social Security Administration by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Blank, Shane)
February 15, 2022 Filing 9 FULL CONSENT has been received by Plaintiff Keith Bratton, Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (JAB)
February 15, 2022 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Shane Kyle Blank for Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Blank, Shane)
February 11, 2022 Filing 7 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (Potter, Jacob)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. This case is assigned to Track: 4 - Administrative. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following provisions apply in this case, and will be modified only upon a showing of exceptional circumstances: This case has been assigned to Track 4 (Administrative). This case has been randomly assigned to a United States Magistrate Judge. The parties have twenty-one (21) days from their entry of appearance to file their Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction forms. Pursuant to 12(a)(3) and (4), Fed.R.Civ.P., defendant must file any motion to dismiss, motion to remand, and/or answer within sixty (60) days of service of plaintiff's complaint. Along with its answer defendant shall file a transcript of the record, in accordance with 42 U.S.C. 405(g). Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 2/11/2022. (CBL)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. (See Full Order.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [ECF No. #3 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall electronically serve the complaint upon the Social Security Administration pursuant to this Court's Administrative Order In re: Service in Civil Actions Under the Social Security Act issued on September 10, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 2/11/2022. (CBL)
February 11, 2022 Filing 4 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - CJA 23 by Plaintiff Keith Bratton. (BAK)
February 11, 2022 Filing 3 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Keith Bratton. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit CJA 23)(Van Fossan, Kristen)
February 11, 2022 Filing 2 SOCIAL SECURITY IDENTIFICATION FORM as to Plaintiff Keith Bratton. (Van Fossan, Kristen)
February 11, 2022 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT Non-Jury Demand,Yes or No - Yes,, filed by Keith Bratton. (Attachments: #1 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Van Fossan, Kristen)
February 11, 2022 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Administrative Transcript Due 4/12/2022 (BAK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bratton v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Bratton
Represented By: Kristen N. Van Fossan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: USAO SSA Division
Represented By: Shane Kyle Blank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?