Smith v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Kilolo Kijakazi, Hazel M Smith and Hazel M. Smith
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 4:2022cv00172
Filed: February 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: John M Bodenhausen
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendnat's First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (Social Security) (Doc. #10 ) is GRANTED. Administrative Transcript Due 6/6/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen on 4/8/22. (SGP)
April 6, 2022 Filing 10 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (Social Security) by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Llewellyn, Nicholas)
February 22, 2022 Filing 9 FULL CONSENT has been received by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi, Plaintiff Hazel M. Smith. (KEK)
February 15, 2022 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholas P. Llewellyn for Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Llewellyn, Nicholas)
February 14, 2022 Filing 7 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (Potter, Jacob)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following provisions apply in this case, and will be modified only upon a showing of exceptional circumstances: This case is assigned to Track: 4. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 3/7/2022... SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen on 02/14/2022. (ANP)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [ECF No. #3 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall electronically serve the complaint upon the Social Security Administration pursuant to this Court's Administrative Order In re: Service in Civil Actions Under the Social Security Act issued on September 10, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen on 02/14/2022. (ANP)
February 14, 2022 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable John M. Bodenhausen. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Administrative Transcript Due 4/15/2022 (JKL)
February 11, 2022 Filing 4 SOCIAL SECURITY IDENTIFICATION FORM as to Plaintiff Hazel M Smith. (Severs, Traci)
February 11, 2022 Filing 3 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - CJA 23 by Plaintiff Hazel M Smith. (Severs, Traci)
February 11, 2022 Filing 2 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Hazel M Smith. (Severs, Traci)
February 11, 2022 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT Non-Jury Demand,Yes or No - Yes,, filed by Hazel M Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form)(Severs, Traci)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hazel M Smith
Represented By: Traci L. Severs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hazel M. Smith
Represented By: Traci L. Severs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?