Bell v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Doris Bell
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 4:2022cv00173
Filed: February 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Clark
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Docket Text ORDER: The Court Grants #7 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File (Answer) Certified Administrative Record by Kilolo Kijakazi. Administrative Transcript is now due by 6/6/2022. Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 4/7/2022. (CBL)
April 6, 2022 Filing 7 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (Social Security) by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Blank, Shane)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Docket Text ORDER: Having considered Plaintiff's #4 Motion for Appointment of Next Friend, the Court notes that Doris A. Bell states in the motion, Doc. 4, and the complaint, Doc. 1, that she is the legal guardian of ANE, a minor. According to Fed. R. Civ. P. 17(c), as legal guardian she may maintain this action on ANE's behalf. The Court therefore denies the motion as moot. Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 3/8/2022. (CLO)
February 23, 2022 Filing 5 SOCIAL SECURITY IDENTIFICATION FORM as to Plaintiff Doris Bell. (Severs, Traci)
February 23, 2022 Filing 4 First MOTION for Appointment of Next Friend as to A.N.E.; relationship to minor:Legal guardian/grandma by Plaintiff Doris Bell. (Severs, Traci) (Modified on 3/9/2022 to remove minor's name from docket entry.) (CBL).
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. (See Full Order.) This case has been assigned to Track 4 (Administrative). Pursuant to Rule 12(a)(3) and (4) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Defendant must file any motion to dismiss, motion to remand, and/or answer within sixty (60) days of service of Plaintiff's Complaint. Along with its answer defendant shall file a transcript of the record, in accordance with 42 U.S.C. 405(g). Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 2/18/2022. (CBL)
February 15, 2022 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Shane Kyle Blank for Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Blank, Shane)
February 14, 2022 ***REMARK: Attorney Traci Severs contacted by Clerk's Office on 2/14/2022 and directed to file Social Security Identification Form. Counsel informed the Clerk's Office at 12:00 pm on 2/14/2022 that she is awaiting information from plaintiff and Social Security Identification Form will be filed at a later date upon receipt of information. (JWD)
February 14, 2022 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Stephen R. Clark. Administrative Transcript Due 4/15/2022 (JWD)
February 13, 2022 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT with receipt number AMOEDC-9125624, in the amount of $402 Non-Jury Demand,Yes or No - No,, filed by Doris Bell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form)(Severs, Traci)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bell v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doris Bell
Represented By: Traci L. Severs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: USAO SSA Division
Represented By: Shane Kyle Blank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?