Soper v. Heinricy
Petitioner: Joshua A. Soper
Respondent: Mike Heinricy
Case Number: 4:2022cv00192
Filed: February 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Clark
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2022 Receipt 4644098822 in the amount of $5.00 for WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS on behalf of Joshua Soper (CCAM)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: Accordingly, the Court directs the Clerk of Court to mail Petitioner a copy of the Court's "Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis and Affidavit in Support Habeas Cases" form. No later than March 25, 2022, Petitioner must either pay the $5.00 filing fee or submit a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. If Petitioner fails to comply with this Order, the Court will dismiss this action without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 2/23/22. (Attachments: #1 moed-0038)(JAB)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 2. Mailed to party not set-up for electronic notification Wed Feb 23 15:50:13 CST 2022 (Bernsen, John)
February 16, 2022 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Wed Feb 16 15:00:48 CST 2022 (admin,)
February 16, 2022 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (DLB)
February 16, 2022 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Stephen R. Clark. (DLB)
February 15, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION FOR A WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS UNDER 28 U.S.C. 2241 by Petitioner Joshua A. Soper. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Judge Assignment Label)(DLB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Soper v. Heinricy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joshua A. Soper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mike Heinricy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?