Martin v. Department of Veterans Affairs
Plaintiff: Elizabeth J. Martin
Defendant: Department of Veterans Affairs
Case Number: 4:2022cv00213
Filed: February 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Henry Edward Autrey
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Review Agency Decision
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2022 Filing 24 Case transferred in from U.S. Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit. Original file and docket sheet received. Clerk's note: Clerk's Office for the U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri notified of case transfer on 2/17/22 when plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis was received in paper format via U.S. Mail. All other filings retrieved from the Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit via PACER. (JWD)
February 22, 2022 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Henry E. Autrey. Per Local Rule 12.01, attorneys who are not admitted to the Eastern District of Missouri do not need to apply for admission pro hac vice in order to practice on a case if they had already filed an entry of appearance before the case was transferred from another United States District Court. For more information, visit #attorney applications. (JWD)
February 22, 2022 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (JWD)
February 22, 2022 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Tue Feb 22 10:04:40 CST 2022 (admin,)
February 11, 2022 Filing 23 Clerk's Letter to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri: Transfer Letter. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. 830632 [MMA] (JWD)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER filed terminating appeal; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1631, this case and all transmittals are transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri. (Per Curiam). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. 830571 (JWD)
January 20, 2022 Filing 21 MODIFIED ENTRY: RESPONSE of Petitioner Elizabeth J. Martin to Doc. No. #18 . Service: 01/20/2022 by clerk. 825578 --[Edited 01/20/2022 by MMA] (JWD)
January 4, 2022 Filing 20 Notice of Unrepresented Person Appearance and consent to Electronic Service for Petitioner Elizabeth J. Martin. Service: 01/06/2022 by clerk. 823133 (JWD)
December 23, 2021 Filing 19 RESPONSE of Respondent DVA to Doc. No. #18 , #18 , #18 , #18 . Service: 12/23/2021 by US mail, email. 820903 [22-1010] (JWD)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER filed The court's November 8, 2021 order is vacated, the mandate recalled, and the petition is reinstated. Within 30 days from the date of filing of this order, the parties are directed to show cause whether this case should be transferred to a United States district court and, if so, to indicate which district court would be most appropriate. The briefing schedule is stayed, and Ms. Martins motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #12 is held in abeyance. (Per Curiam). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. 816017 (JWD)
December 2, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Petitioner Elizabeth J. Martin, Notice of Unrepresented Person Appearance #16 , is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 12/16/2021. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. 815830 (JWD)
December 1, 2021 Filing 16 Notice of Unrepresented Person Appearance and consent to Electronic Service for Petitioner Elizabeth J. Martin. Service: 12/01/2021 by clerk. 815679 This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. #17 (JWD)
November 24, 2021 Filing 15 Entry of appearance for Delisa M. Sanchez as counsel for Respondent DVA. Service: 11/24/2021 by email, US mail. 814798 [22-1010] (JWD)
November 19, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Petitioner Elizabeth J. Martin, Notice of Unrepresented Person Appearance #10 , is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 12/03/2021. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. 813614 (JWD)
November 18, 2021 Filing 13 MODIFIED ENTRY: MOTION of Petitioner Elizabeth J. Martin to reopen case. Service: 11/19/2021 by clerk. 813578 --[Edited 11/19/2021 by MMA] (JWD)
November 18, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Elizabeth J. Martin. (JWD)
November 18, 2021 Filing 11 Statement Concerning Discrimination pursuant to Fed. Cir. R. 15(c) for Petitioner Elizabeth J. Martin. Service: 11/19/2021 by clerk. 813576
November 18, 2021 Filing 10 Notice of Unrepresented Person Appearance and consent to Electronic Filing for Petitioner Elizabeth J. Martin. Service: 11/19/2021 by clerk. 813575 This document has been corrected. See Doc. No. #14 (JWD)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER dismissing appeal for failure to prosecute in accordance with the rules; (no fee; no 15(c)); issuing mandate. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. 810880 Mandate has been recalled pursuant to the court's order #18 (JWD)
November 4, 2021 Filing 8 Notice to Respondent DVA: The record of this case indicates that no Entry of Appearance under FCR 47.3(b) has been filed. Failure to file required documents may result in dismissal or other action as deemed appropriate by the court. See FCR 25(h). Please file promptly. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. 810318 (JWD)
October 18, 2021 Filing 7 Certified list received. Service: 10/15/2021 by email. Refer to Fed. Cir. R. 31 for calculating brief deadlines from service of the certified list. 806357 (JWD)
October 4, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Petitioner Elizabeth J. Martin, Notice of Unrepresented Person Appearance; Docketing Statement #2 , #3 , is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 10/18/2021. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. 803357 (JWD)
October 4, 2021 Filing 5 INFORMAL BRIEF FILED with APPENDIX by Petitioner Elizabeth J. Martin. Service: 10/04/2021 by clerk. 803356 (JWD)
October 4, 2021 Filing 4 Transcript Purchase Order Form for the Petitioner Elizabeth J. Martin indicating that a request is made to the reporter for a transcript. Service: 10/04/2021 by clerk. 803355 (JWD)
October 4, 2021 Filing 3 Docketing Statement for the Petitioner Elizabeth J. Martin. Service: 10/04/2021 by clerk. 803353 This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. #6 (JWD)
October 4, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Unrepresented Person Appearance and consent to Electronic Filing for Petitioner Elizabeth J.Martin. Service: 10/04/2021 by clerk. 803352 This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. #6 . (JWD)
October 4, 2021 Filing 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 09/29/2021. 803348 Fee/IFP due on 10/18/2021. 15(c) due on 10/18/2021. Entry of Appearance due 10/18/2021. Certified List due on 11/15/2021.(JWD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. Department of Veterans Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth J. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Veterans Affairs
Represented By: Delisa Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?