Hornbeck v. Archdiocese of St. Louis et al
Plaintiff: Christian Hornbeck
Defendant: Good Shepherd Children and Family Services, Catholic Charities of St. Louis, Archdiocese of St. Louis, Alexander Anderson, Mitchell T Rozanski, Robert Carlson, Catholic Services for Children and Youth, St. Joseph and Sisters of St. Joseph of Carondelet, St. Louis Province
Case Number: 4:2022cv00345
Filed: March 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Catherine D Perry
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2022 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by Defendant Sisters of St. Joseph of Carondelet, St. Louis Province. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Comparison between the Complaint and the proposed Amended Complaint)(Niemeier, David)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #22 First MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation of Memoranda In Opposition to Defendants Anderson and Sisters of St. Joseph of Carondelet's Motions to Dismiss by Plaintiff Christian Hornbeck. (Randles, Rebecca) ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 05/18/2022. (KRZ)
May 16, 2022 Filing 22 First MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation of Memoranda In Opposition to Defendants Anderson and Sisters of St. Joseph of Carondelet's Motions to Dismiss by Plaintiff Christian Hornbeck. (Randles, Rebecca)
May 16, 2022 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Dismiss :the Complaint by Sisters of St. Joseph of Carondelet, St. Louis Province filed by Plaintiff Christian Hornbeck. (Randles, Rebecca)
May 16, 2022 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Anderson filed by Plaintiff Christian Hornbeck. (Randles, Rebecca)
May 16, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION to Amend/Correct by Plaintiff Christian Hornbeck. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First Amended Petition and Jury Demand)(Randles, Rebecca)
May 16, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Christian Hornbeck Process Server: Missouri Process Serving, LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Randles, Rebecca)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff shall show cause in writing by Tuesday, May 17, 2022, why defendants' motions to dismiss, filed as Docket Numbers #9 and #12 , should not be granted in their entirety for the reasons set out by defendants. This Order to Show Cause will be deemed satisfied if plaintiff files his memoranda in opposition to the motions by Tuesday, May 17, 2022. No extensions of time to respond to this Memorandum and Order to Show Cause will be granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall cause timely service of the complaint to be made upon defendants Mitchell Rozanski, Robert Carlson, Good Shepherd Children and Family Services, and Catholic Charities of St. Louis, and shall file proof of service upon these defendants, or request an extension of time to obtain service, by June 22, 2022, or these unserved defendants will be dismissed without prejudice under Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure without further notice by the Court. (Show Cause Response due by 5/17/2022.) Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 05/13/2022. (ANP)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #15 MOTION for Leave to File Response to MTD in Stanter ; #14 MOTION for Leave to File Response to MTD in Stanter ; ORDERED Construed as a motion for more time and GRANTED; plaintiff's response to both motions to dismiss now due 5/5/22. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 4/27/22. (CDP)
April 25, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to File Response to MTD in Stanter by Plaintiff Christian Hornbeck. (Randles, Rebecca) Modified on 4/26/2022 - termed motion, duplicative filing of doc #14 (ANP).
April 25, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to File Response to MTD in Stanter by Plaintiff Christian Hornbeck. (Randles, Rebecca)
April 21, 2022 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #12 MOTION to Dismiss :the Complaint filed by Defendant Sisters of St. Joseph of Carondelet, St. Louis Province. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Public Record from the Missouri Secretary of State)(Niemeier, David)
April 21, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss :the Complaint by Defendant Sisters of St. Joseph of Carondelet, St. Louis Province. (Niemeier, David)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to the Complaint by Defendant Sisters of St. Joseph of Carondelet, St. Louis Province. (Niemeier, David) filed by Sisters of St. Joseph of Carondelet, St. Louis Province ; ORDERED GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Sisters of St. Joseph of Carondelet, St. Louis Province answer due 4/21/2022. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 04/01/2022. (ANP)
March 31, 2022 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Alexander Anderson. (Carmody, Ryann)
March 31, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Alexander Anderson. (Carmody, Ryann)
March 31, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to the Complaint by Defendant Sisters of St. Joseph of Carondelet, St. Louis Province. (Niemeier, David)
March 24, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Sisters of St. Joseph of Carondelet, St. Louis Province Sent To: State Court - Executed (Niemeier, David)
March 24, 2022 Filing 6 Consent to Removal by Defendant Alexander Anderson. (Carmody, Ryann)
March 24, 2022 Filing 5 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, City of St Louis, filed by Christian Hornbeck.(BAK)
March 24, 2022 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Amy Christine Moorkamp for Defendant Sisters of St. Joseph of Carondelet, St. Louis Province. (Moorkamp, Amy)
March 24, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Sisters of St. Joseph of Carondelet, St. Louis Province Sent To: Plaintiff (Niemeier, David)
March 24, 2022 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Sisters of St. Joseph of Carondelet, St. Louis Province. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Niemeier, David)
March 24, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Twenty-Second Judicial Circuit Court, St. Louis City, Missouri, case number 2222-CC00244, with receipt number AMOEDC-9201326, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Sisters of St. Joseph of Carondelet, St. Louis Province. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court File, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form)(Niemeier, David)
March 24, 2022 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Catherine D. Perry. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). (BAK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hornbeck v. Archdiocese of St. Louis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Good Shepherd Children and Family Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catholic Charities of St. Louis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Archdiocese of St. Louis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Anderson
Represented By: Ryan Matthew Prsha
Represented By: Ryann Case Carmody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell T Rozanski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catholic Services for Children and Youth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sisters of St. Joseph of Carondelet, St. Louis Province
Represented By: David P. Niemeier
Represented By: Amy Christine Moorkamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Hornbeck
Represented By: Rebecca M. Randles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?