Davidson Surface/Air, Inc. v. Zurich American Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Davidson Surface/Air, Inc.
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company doing business as Zurich
Case Number: 4:2022cv00547
Filed: May 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Catherine D Perry
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution. This case is referred to: Mediation Designation of Lead Counsel: Jack B. Spooner. ADR Completion Deadline due by 11/30/2022. ADR Compliance Report Deadline due by 12/14/2022. Designation of Neutral/Conference Report due by 10/20/2022... SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 06/23/2022. (ANP)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following schedule shall apply in this case, and will be modified only upon a showing of exceptional circumstances: This case is assigned to Track 2. Motion to Join Parties due by 8/23/2022. Discovery Completion due by 5/31/2023. Non-Dispositive Motions due by 6/7/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 6/28/2023. Jury Trial set for 11/6/2023 08:30 AM before District Judge Catherine D. Perry. Pretrial Compliance due by 10/17/2023. Motion in Limine due by 10/27/2023... SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 06/23/2022. (ANP)
June 16, 2022 Filing 10 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Defendant Zurich American Insurance Company. . (Moore, Stephen)
May 24, 2022 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Davidson Surface/Air, Inc... (Spooner, Jack)
May 24, 2022 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Jack B. Spooner for Plaintiff Davidson Surface/Air, Inc.. (Spooner, Jack)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CONFERENCE. This case is assigned to Track 2. Joint Scheduling Plan due by 6/16/2022. Rule 16 Conference set for 6/23/2022 01:00 PM in Telephone Conference in Chambers before District Judge Catherine D. Perry... SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 05/23/2022. (ANP)
May 23, 2022 Filing 6 Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate to Plaintiff Davidson Surface/Air, Inc.. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental organizational party must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within ten (10) days of the party's first pleading or entry of appearance. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible # (moed-0001.pdf). Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 6/2/2022. (ANP)
May 20, 2022 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Zurich American Insurance Company. Parent companies: Zurich Insurance Group Ltd, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: Zurich Insurance Group Ltd,. (Moore, Stephen)
May 20, 2022 Filing 4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, St. Louis County Missouri, filed by Davidson Surface/Air, Inc..(BAK)
May 20, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Zurich American Insurance Company Sent To: Plaintiff (Moore, Stephen)
May 20, 2022 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by Zurich American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Moore, Stephen)
May 20, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of St. Louis County, case number 22SL-CC00855, with receipt number AMOEDC-9302470, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Zurich American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form , #3 Attachment State Court Record)(Moore, Stephen)
May 20, 2022 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Catherine D. Perry. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). (BAK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davidson Surface/Air, Inc. v. Zurich American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Davidson Surface/Air, Inc.
Represented By: Jack B. Spooner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company doing business as Zurich
Represented By: Stephen J. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?