Jones v. Centene Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Lincston Jones
Defendant: Centene Corporation, Centene Management Company, LLC, WellCare Health Plans, Inc. and Comprehensive Health Management, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2022cv00603
Filed: June 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Rodney W Sippel
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Docket Text ORDER: re: #11 , #12 , and #13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Breanne Sheetz Martell, Steven Kaplan, and Camellia Mokri; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 7/1/2022. (KEK)
June 30, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Camellia Mokri. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-9377199) by Defendants Centene Corporation, Centene Management Company, LLC, Comprehensive Health Management, Inc., WellCare Health Plans, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Mokri, Camellia)
June 30, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Steven Kaplan. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-9377196) by Defendants Centene Corporation, Centene Management Company, LLC, Comprehensive Health Management, Inc., WellCare Health Plans, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Kaplan, Steven)
June 30, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Breanne Sheetz Martell. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-9377178) by Defendants Centene Corporation, Centene Management Company, LLC, Comprehensive Health Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Sheetz Martell, Breanne)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice C.K. Lee, Esq. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-9373774) by Plaintiff Lincston Jones. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing for CK Lee, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - List of Admitted Jurisdictions for CK Lee)(Lee, C.) filed by Lincston Jones; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 6/30/2022. (KEK)
June 29, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice C.K. Lee, Esq.. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-9373774) by Plaintiff Lincston Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing for CK Lee, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - List of Admitted Jurisdictions for CK Lee)(Lee, C.)
June 27, 2022 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant WellCare Health Plans, Inc.. Parent companies: Centene Corporation, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: Centene Corporation,. (Martin, Patricia)
June 27, 2022 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Comprehensive Health Management, Inc.. Parent companies: The Wellcare Management Group, Inc. (wholly owned by WCG Health Management, Inc., wholly owned by Wellcare Health Plans, Inc., wholly owned by Centene Corporation, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Martin, Patricia)
June 27, 2022 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Centene Management Company, LLC. Parent companies: N/A, Subsidiaries: N/A, Publicly held company: N/A,. (Martin, Patricia)
June 27, 2022 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Centene Corporation. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: The Vanguard Group,. (Martin, Patricia)
June 27, 2022 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Patricia J. Martin for Defendants Centene Corporation, Centene Management Company, LLC, Comprehensive Health Management, Inc., WellCare Health Plans, Inc.. (Martin, Patricia)
June 23, 2022 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Lincston Jones All Defendants. (Wise, Brandon)
June 9, 2022 Summons Issued as to defendant All Defendants. The summons was emailed to Brandon Wise. (KRZ)
June 7, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Lincston Jones Process Server: ABC Legal Services (Wise, Brandon)
June 6, 2022 ***REMARK ATTORNEY BRANDON MICHAEL WISE DIRECTED TO FILE NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER ON 6-6-2022 AT 9:12 AM. (JDC)
June 6, 2022 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Rodney W. Sippel. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). (JDC)
June 3, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-9328008, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Lincston Jones. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Acquisition of WellCare, #3 Exhibit B - State Care, #4 Exhibit C - Contact Information, #5 Exhibit D - Purpose, #6 Exhibit E - Welcome Letter, #7 Exhibit F - Consent to Sue, #8 Original Filing Form, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons)(Wise, Brandon) Modified on 6/6/2022 (JDC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Centene Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lincston Jones
Represented By: Brandon Michael Wise
Represented By: C. K. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centene Corporation
Represented By: Breanne Sheetz Martell
Represented By: Camellia S. Mokri
Represented By: Patricia J. Martin
Represented By: Steven Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centene Management Company, LLC
Represented By: Breanne Sheetz Martell
Represented By: Camellia S. Mokri
Represented By: Patricia J. Martin
Represented By: Steven Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WellCare Health Plans, Inc.
Represented By: Camellia S. Mokri
Represented By: Patricia J. Martin
Represented By: Steven Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comprehensive Health Management, Inc.
Represented By: Breanne Sheetz Martell
Represented By: Camellia S. Mokri
Represented By: Patricia J. Martin
Represented By: Steven Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?