Weger v. Cushman & Wakefield U.S., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Luis Weger
Defendant: Mastercard International Incorporated and Cushman & Wakefield U.S., Inc.
Case Number: 4:2022cv00609
Filed: June 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Clark
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 38 U.S.C. ยง 4323 Veterans Re-employment Rights Act (VRRA)
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Docket Text ORDER: The Court grants Plaintiff Luis Weger's #23 Motion to Continue Rule 16 Conference. On August 24, 2022 at 4:30 p.m., the Court will hold a Rule 16 conference by Zoom. Conference participants will receive an email with a link to access the conference. Lead trial counsel must participate in the conference. The joint proposed scheduling plan remains due no later than August 8, 2022. (Rule 16 Conference set for 8/24/2022 04:30 PM in Zoom Video Conference before District Judge Stephen R. Clark.) Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 7/22/22. (JAB)
July 19, 2022 Filing 23 MOTION to Continue RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Plaintiff Luis Weger. (Hackney, Jeffrey)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pursuant to the Civil Justice Reform Act Expense and Delay Reduction Plan and the Differentiated Case Management Program of the United States District Court of the Eastern District of Missouri, the Court orders the following schedule: 1. Scheduling conference: Pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, a scheduling conference is set for August 18, 2022 at 4:00 p.m. CT by Zoom. Conference participants will receive an email with a link to access the conference. Lead trial counsel must participate in the conference. (Joint Scheduling Plan due by 8/8/2022. Rule 16 Conference set for 8/18/2022 04:00 PM in Zoom Video Conference before District Judge Stephen R. Clark.) Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 7/19/22. (JAB)
July 19, 2022 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint Defendant Cushman & Wakefield's Answer and Affirmative and Other Defenses by Cushman & Wakefield U.S., Inc..(Yates, Kimberly)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Robin Jonathan Samuel. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-9384636) by Defendant Mastercard International Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Samuel, Robin); ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 7/7/2022. (CLT)
July 6, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Robin Jonathan Samuel. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-9384636) by Defendant Mastercard International Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Samuel, Robin)
July 5, 2022 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint by Mastercard International Incorporated.(Charron, Joseph)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Docket Text ORDER: The Court grants #16 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Cushman & Wakefield U.S., Inc.. (Yates, Kimberly) (Cushman & Wakefield U.S., Inc. answer due 7/19/2022.) Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 6/30/2022. (LNJ)
June 29, 2022 Filing 16 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Cushman & Wakefield U.S., Inc.. (Yates, Kimberly)
June 27, 2022 Filing 15 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Stephen R. Clark for all further proceedings. (HMA)
June 24, 2022 Filing 14 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Cushman & Wakefield U.S., Inc.. Parent companies: Cushman & Wakefield, plc, Subsidiaries: Cushman & Wakefield U.S., Publicly held company: None,. (Yates, Kimberly)
June 24, 2022 Filing 13 Electronic Notice of Noncompliance - Review of this case shows the Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate has not been filed by Defendant Cushman & Wakefield U.S., Inc.. The certificate must be filed with the Court within 5 days # (moed-0001.pdf). Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 6/30/2022. (CBL)
June 17, 2022 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Mastercard International Incorporated. Parent companies: Mastercard Incorporated, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Charron, Joseph)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' respective unopposed motions for extension of time are each GRANTED. [Docs. 8, 9, 10.] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall file their respective responsive pleadings to Plaintiff's Petition no later than July 5, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on June 14, 2022. (JMR)
June 14, 2022 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #2 Petition (Removal/Transfer) by Defendant Cushman & Wakefield U.S., Inc.. (Yates, Kimberly)
June 13, 2022 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead in Response to Plaintiff's Petition for Damages by Defendant Mastercard International Incorporated. (Charron, Joseph)
June 9, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Cushman & Wakefield U.S., Inc.. (Yates, Kimberly)
June 9, 2022 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Ashley Nicole Farris for Defendant Cushman & Wakefield U.S., Inc.. (Farris, Ashley)
June 9, 2022 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Kimberly A. Yates for Defendant Cushman & Wakefield U.S., Inc.. (Yates, Kimberly)
June 8, 2022 Filing 5 Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate to Defendant Mastercard International Incorporated. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental organizational party must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within ten (10) days of the party's first pleading or entry of appearance. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible # (moed-0001.pdf). Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 6/17/2022. (HMA)
June 7, 2022 Filing 4 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (Potter, Jacob)
June 7, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Mastercard International Incorporated Sent To: Plaintiff (Charron, Joseph)
June 7, 2022 Filing 2 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Charles County, filed by Luis Weger.(JDC)
June 7, 2022 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Nannette A. Baker. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). (JDC)
June 6, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Petition from Circuit Court of St. Charles County, Missouri, case number 2211-cc00360, with receipt number AMOEDC-9330905, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Mastercard International Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court File, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form Original filing form)(Charron, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weger v. Cushman & Wakefield U.S., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Weger
Represented By: Jeffrey David Hackney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mastercard International Incorporated
Represented By: Joseph Thomas Charron, Jr.
Represented By: Robin J. Samuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cushman & Wakefield U.S., Inc.
Represented By: Kimberly A. Yates
Represented By: Ashley Nicole Farris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?