Graeff v. United States Election Assistance Commission et al
Plaintiff: Alison Graeff and Ali
Defendant: United States Election Assistance Commission, Thomas Hicks, Christy McCormick, Benjamin W. Hovland, Donald L. Palmer and John J. Ashcroft
Case Number: 4:2022cv00682
Filed: June 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Sarah E Pitlyk
Referring Judge: Ronnie L White
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 241 Conspiracy Against Citizen Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2022 Filing 35 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION #8 AND IN SUPPORT OF FEDERAL DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION #31 by Defendants Thomas Hicks, Benjamin W. Hovland, Christy McCormick, Donald L. Palmer, United States Election Assistance Commission. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark A. Robbins)(TMT)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Federal Defendants' Motion for Leave to File a Consolidated Brief of up to 30 Pages (ECF No. 30) is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court shall detach and docket the Federal Defendants' Combined Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and in Support of Federal Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (ECF No. 30-1), which was submitted as an attachment to the Motion for Leave. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 8/12/22. (JEB)
August 12, 2022 Filing 33 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #32 MOTION to Dismiss Case and Opposing Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendant John J. Ashcroft. (Dierker, Catherine)
August 12, 2022 Filing 32 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant John J. Ashcroft. (Dierker, Catherine)
August 12, 2022 Filing 31 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendants Thomas Hicks, Benjamin W. Hovland, Christy McCormick, Donald L. Palmer, United States Election Assistance Commission. (Konkoly, Antonia)
August 12, 2022 Filing 30 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Defendants Thomas Hicks, Benjamin W. Hovland, Christy McCormick, Donald L. Palmer, United States Election Assistance Commission. (Attachments: #1 Federal Defendants' Combined Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction and In Support of the Federal Defendants' Motion To Dismiss, #2 b.Declaration of Mark A. Robbins and accompanying Exhibits A through I)(Konkoly, Antonia)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 34. Fri Aug 12 15:54:12 CDT 2022 (Tillman, Tiffani)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Federal Defendants' Motion for Leave to File a Consolidated Brief of Up to 30 Pages (ECF No. 28) is DENIED without prejudice because the proposed overlength memorandum was not attached to the motion for leave, as required by the Courts CM/ECF Procedures Manual, Section II.B. The Court will not grant leave to file an overlength memorandum until it has reviewed the document. Federal Defendants may refile their motion for leave with the proposed overlength memorandum submitted as an attachment thereto. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 8/8/22. (JEB)
August 8, 2022 Filing 28 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Defendants Thomas Hicks, Benjamin W. Hovland, Christy McCormick, Donald L. Palmer, United States Election Assistance Commission. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Konkoly, Antonia)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Federal Defendants' Motion for Leave to File a Consolidated Response to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint and Opposition to her Motion for Preliminary Injunction (ECF No. #19 ), Defendant Ashcroft's Motion to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleading (ECF No. #21 ), and Defendant Ashcroft's Motion to Extend Time Allowed to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (ECF No. #22 ) are GRANTED, in part. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint and Motion for Preliminary Injunction no later than August 12, 2022. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on July 29, 2022. (BRP)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 27. Sent to non-electronic party this date. Fri Jul 29 14:57:09 CDT 2022 (Porter, Brittany)
July 28, 2022 Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re #21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading filed by Plaintiff Alison Graeff. (KXS)
July 22, 2022 Filing 25 EXHIBITS 12-22 to Amended Complaint #23 by Plaintiff Alison Graeff. (KXS) (Plaintiff resent the exhibits in a smaller format; therefore, all exhibits have been attached to the Amended Complaint #23 and the documents attached this entry have been deleted) Modified on 7/25/2022 (KXS).
July 22, 2022 Filing 24 EXHIBITS 1-11 to Amended Complaint #23 by Plaintiff Alison Graeff. (KXS) (Plaintiff resent the exhibits in a smaller format; therefore, all exhibits have been attached to the Amended Complaint #23 and the documents attached this entry have been deleted) Modified on 7/25/2022 (KXS).
July 22, 2022 Filing 23 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants; Amendment to #1 Complaint filed by Alison Graeff. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KXS) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/25/2022: #2 Exhibits 1-11, #3 Exhibits 12-22, #4 Exhibit 23, #5 Exhibit 24) (KXS).
July 22, 2022 Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of: Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Defendant John J. Ashcroft. (Dierker, Catherine)
July 21, 2022 Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of: Time to File Responsive Pleading by Defendant John J. Ashcroft. (Dierker, Catherine)
July 21, 2022 Filing 20 ENTRY of Appearance by Catherine Dierker for Defendant John J. Ashcroft. (Dierker, Catherine)
July 19, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to File a Consolidated Response to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint and Opposition to Her Motion for a Preliminary Injunction by Defendants Thomas Hicks, Benjamin W. Hovland, Christy McCormick, Donald L. Palmer, United States Election Assistance Commission. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Konkoly, Antonia)
July 19, 2022 Filing 18 ENTRY of Appearance by Antonia Konkoly for Defendants Thomas Hicks, Benjamin W. Hovland, Christy McCormick, Donald L. Palmer, United States Election Assistance Commission. (Konkoly, Antonia)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint (ECF No. #7 ) is DENIED as moot. Plaintiff shall file a clean, final copy of her First Amended Complaint, with any exhibits, no later than July 25, 2022. (Response to Court due by 7/25/2022.) Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 7/18/2022. (TMT)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 17. Mon Jul 18 13:39:20 CDT 2022 (Tillman, Tiffani)
July 15, 2022 Filing 16 REASSIGNMENT ORDER (GJL). District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk no longer assigned to case. Case reassigned to District Judge Ronnie L. White for all further proceedings. (KXS)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER OF RECUSAL: Accordingly, the Clerk of the Court shall draw the name of a District Judge for assignment of this case. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 07/15/2022. (ANP)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 16. Fri Jul 15 15:27:19 CDT 2022 (Spurgeon, Katherine)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 15. Fri Jul 15 15:14:45 CDT 2022 (Petri, Alexis)
July 14, 2022 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Alison Graeff. Defendant United States Election Assistance Commission served on 6/29/2022, answer due 8/29/2022. (ANP)
July 14, 2022 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Alison Graeff. John J. Ashcroft served on 7/1/2022, answer due 7/22/2022. (ANP)
July 14, 2022 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Alison Graeff. Donald L. Palmer served on 7/1/2022, answer due 7/22/2022. (ANP)
July 14, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Alison Graeff. Benjamin W. Hovland served on 7/1/2022, answer due 7/22/2022. (ANP)
July 14, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Alison Graeff. Christy McCormick served on 7/1/2022, answer due 7/22/2022. (ANP)
July 14, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Alison Graeff. Thomas Hicks served on 7/1/2022, answer due 7/22/2022. (ANP)
July 14, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support of Their Motion For Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Alison Graeff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-K, #2 Exhibit L-T, #3 Exhibit U-W, #4 Exhibit X)(ANP)
July 14, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Petition by Plaintiff Alison Graeff. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Amended Petition)(ANP)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Doc. #3 , is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff may file a motion for preliminary injunction only after all Defendants have been properly served. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 6/30/2022. (NEP)
June 30, 2022 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENTAL/Submission of Evidentiary Documents re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Alison Graeff. (ANP)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 6. Thu Jun 30 17:58:12 CDT 2022 (Phillips, Nicole)
June 28, 2022 Receipt 4644100793 in the amount of $402.00 for CIVIL FILING FEE on behalf of Alison Graeff (CCAM)
June 28, 2022 Filing 4 Notice Requesting Hearing on Motion For Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Alison Graeff re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (JDC)
June 28, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Alison Graeff. (JDC)
June 28, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Alison Graeff Process Server: Cole County Sheriff (JDC)
June 28, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants, Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Alison Graeff. (Attachments: #1 Original Filing Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Index of Authorites and Exhibits, #4 Summons Hicks, #5 Summons Ashcroft, #6 Summons Fleming, #7 Summons Garland, #8 Summons Hovland, #9 Summons McCormic, #10 Summons Palmer)(JDC)
June 28, 2022 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Tue Jun 28 17:02:14 CDT 2022 (admin,)
June 28, 2022 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (JDC)
June 28, 2022 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Sarah E. Pitlyk. 7 Summons(es) issued and hand delivered to Plaintiff Allison Graeff. (JDC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Graeff v. United States Election Assistance Commission et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alison Graeff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Election Assistance Commission
Represented By: Antonia Konkoly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Hicks
Represented By: Antonia Konkoly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christy McCormick
Represented By: Antonia Konkoly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin W. Hovland
Represented By: Antonia Konkoly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald L. Palmer
Represented By: Antonia Konkoly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John J. Ashcroft
Represented By: Catherine Dierker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?