Muller v. Blue Diamond Growers
Plaintiff: Beth Peacock Muller
Defendant: Blue Diamond Growers and Does 1 through 10
Case Number: 4:2022cv00707
Filed: July 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Rodney W Sippel
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jason E. Kornmehl. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-9470780) by Defendant Blue Diamond Growers. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing of Jason E. Kornmehl)(Kornmehl, Jason) filed by Blue Diamond Growers ; ORDERED GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 08/25/2022. (ANP)
August 24, 2022 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jason E. Kornmehl. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-9470780) by Defendant Blue Diamond Growers. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing of Jason E. Kornmehl)(Kornmehl, Jason)
August 23, 2022 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Missouri State Court filed by Defendant Blue Diamond Growers. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christian Albitz, #2 Declaration of Colleen Gulliver, #3 Declaration of Maya Erwin)(Rankin, W.)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Elizabeth J. Jonas The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-9447479) by Defendant Blue Diamond Growers. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing of Elizabeth J. Jonas)(Jonas, Elizabeth) filed by Blue Diamond Growers; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 8/12/2022. (KEK)
August 11, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Elizabeth J. Jonas The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-9447479) by Defendant Blue Diamond Growers. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing of Elizabeth J. Jonas)(Jonas, Elizabeth)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Colleen M. Gulliver. AND #17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Rachael C. Kessler. ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 8/10/2022. (NEP)
August 9, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Rachael C. Kessler. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-9443181) by Defendant Blue Diamond Growers. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing for Rachael C. Kessler)(Kessler, Rachael)
August 9, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Colleen M. Gulliver. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number CMOEDC-9442495) by Defendant Blue Diamond Growers. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Colleen M. Gulliver Certificate of Good Standing)(Gulliver, Colleen)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Blue Diamond Growers' motion for extension of time to file a response, #14 , is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Blue Diamond Growers shall file its response to Plaintiff Beth Peacock Muller's motion to remand no later than August 23, 2022, and Muller shall file her reply no later than September 6, 2022. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 07/26/2022. (ANP)
July 25, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand by Defendant Blue Diamond Growers. (Rankin, W.)
July 21, 2022 Filing 13 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Rodney W. Sippel for all further proceedings. (JEB)
July 21, 2022 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by W. Jason Rankin for Defendant Blue Diamond Growers. (Rankin, W.)
July 19, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Missouri State Court by Plaintiff Beth Peacock Muller. (Harvath, Daniel)
July 8, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE Appearance: by Defendant Blue Diamond Growers (Nickel, Matthew)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Docket Text ORDER: Re #6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Blue Diamond Growers; ORDERED GRANTED. Blue Diamond Growers answer due 30 days after the Court's ruling on the plaintiff's forthcoming motion to remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on 7/7/22. (EAB)
July 5, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Blue Diamond Growers Sent To: Plaintiff (Nickel, Matthew)
July 5, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Blue Diamond Growers Sent To: State Court - Executed (Attachments: #1 Exhibit BDG's Notice of Filing of Removal in St. Louis County Circuit Court, Case No. 22SL-CC02735)(Nickel, Matthew)
July 5, 2022 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Blue Diamond Growers. (Nickel, Matthew)
July 5, 2022 Filing 5 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (Potter, Jacob)
July 5, 2022 Filing 4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: St. Louis County Circuit Court, filed by Beth Peacock Muller.(JBH)
July 5, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Blue Diamond Growers Sent To: Plaintiff (JBH)
July 5, 2022 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Blue Diamond Growers. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (JBH)
July 5, 2022 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Shirley P. Mensah. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. (JBH)
July 1, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for St. Louis County, case number 22SL-CC02735, with receipt number AMOEDC-9379396, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Blue Diamond Growers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1: Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form, #4 Exhibit Disclosure of Organizational Interests, #5 Exhibit Current State Docket and Filings, #6 Exhibit Notice to Plaintiff)(Nickel, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Muller v. Blue Diamond Growers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beth Peacock Muller
Represented By: Daniel F. Harvath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Diamond Growers
Represented By: Matthew T. Nickel
Represented By: Colleen Gulliver
Represented By: W. Jason Rankin
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Jonas
Represented By: Jason Kornmehl
Represented By: Rachael Kessler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?