Foster v. Saia Logistics Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Rodney Foster
Defendant: Saia Logistics Services, LLC
Case Number: 4:2022cv00915
Filed: September 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Shirley Padmore Mensah
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2617 Family Medical Leave Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Rodney Foster. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed First Amended Complaint)(Blankenship, Mark)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution. (See Full Order) This case is referred to: Mediation. Designation of Lead Counsel: Joseph A. Ott. Designation of Neutral/Conference Report due by 3/22/2023. ADR Completion Deadline due by 5/1/2023. ADR Compliance Report Deadline due by 5/15/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on 10/4/2022. (JEB)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (See Full Order) This case is assigned to Track 2 Standard. Motion to Join Parties due by 10/24/2022. Discovery Completion due by 4/3/2023. Non-Dispositive Motions due by 4/17/2023. ADR Future Reference 3/1/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 6/5/2023. Status Conference set for 3/21/2023 10:00 AM in Courtroom 13S - St. Louis before Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah. This action must be ready for trial by no later than February 12, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on 10/4/2022. (HMA)
October 4, 2022 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah:Rule 16 Conference held on 10/4/2022. Conference held by zoom. The Court and counsel discussed deadlines in the case. Case Management Order and ADR Referral Order to follow. (proceedings started: 10:09 am) (proceedings ended: 10:32 am) (JEB) (Main Document 13 replaced on 10/4/2022) (JEB).
October 3, 2022 Filing 12 FULL CONSENT has been received. (JEB)
September 28, 2022 Filing 11 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Defendant Saia Logistics Services, LLC. and Plaintiff Rodney Foster. (Jellinek, Charles)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Rule 16 Conference set for October 5, 2022, is re-set for October 4, 2022, at 10:00 AM in Zoom Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah. Hearing participants will receive a separate email with a link to join the hearing by Zoom. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on 9/21/2022. (GGB)
September 6, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Saia Logistics Services, LLC Sent To: State Court - Executed (Jellinek, Charles)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RULE 16 ORDER (See Full Order) This case is assigned to Track 2 Standard. Joint Scheduling Plan due by 9/28/2022. Rule 16 Conference set for 10/5/2022 10:00 AM in Zoom Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 9/28/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on 9/2/2022. (HMA)
September 1, 2022 Filing 7 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (Potter, Jacob)
September 1, 2022 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint and Other Defenses by Saia Logistics Services, LLC.(Jellinek, Charles)
September 1, 2022 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Danielle Ashley Pajda for Defendant Saia Logistics Services, LLC. (Pajda, Danielle)
September 1, 2022 Filing 4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: St. Louis County Circuit Court, filed by Rodney Foster.(JBH)
September 1, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Saia Logistics Services, LLC - sent to Plaintiff's Counsel Sent To: Plaintiff (Jellinek, Charles)
September 1, 2022 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Saia Logistics Services, LLC, Saia TL Plus LLC, Saia Inc. (Jellinek, Charles) Modified on 9/29/2022 (CBL).
September 1, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis County Circuit Court, case number 22SL-CC03491, with receipt number AMOEDC-9484254, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Saia Logistics Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Documents served on Defendant, #2 Exhibit B - State court file, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Original Filing Form)(Jellinek, Charles)
September 1, 2022 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Shirley P. Mensah. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. (JBH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foster v. Saia Logistics Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Foster
Represented By: Joseph A. Ott
Represented By: Mark Edward Blankenship, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saia Logistics Services, LLC
Represented By: Charles B. Jellinek
Represented By: Danielle Ashley Pajda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?