Hunter v. Title Max
Plaintiff: Georgia M. Hunter
Defendant: Title Max
Case Number: 4:2022cv01046
Filed: September 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Audrey G Fleissig
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2022 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENTAL re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Georgia M. Hunter. (JMP)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis [ECF No. #2 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff must show cause no later than twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order as to why this action should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for appointment of counsel [ECF No. #3 ] is DENIED AT THIS TIME. Plaintiffs failure to timely comply with this Order could result in the dismissal of this action, without prejudice and without further notice. (Show Cause Response due by 10/25/2022.) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 10/4/22. (KJS)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 4. Tue Oct 4 12:38:58 CDT 2022 (Shirley, Kelley)
September 30, 2022 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Fri Sep 30 09:01:17 CDT 2022 (admin,)
September 30, 2022 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (JDC)
September 30, 2022 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Audrey G. Fleissig. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within 10 days of the filing of the first pleading or entry of appearance # (moed-0001.pdf). (JDC)
September 29, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Georgia M. Hunter. (JDC) Modified on 9/30/2022 to correct filed date (JDC).
September 29, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Georgia M. Hunter. (JDC) Modified on 9/30/2022 to correct filed date (JDC).
September 29, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants Jury Demand,, filed by Georgia M. Hunter. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Envelope)(JDC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunter v. Title Max
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgia M. Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Title Max
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?