United States of America v. $30,200.00 U.S. Currency in lieu of 2013 Audi S8 Quattro et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $30,200.00 U.S. Currency in lieu of 2013 Audi S8 Quattro, $1,000,000.00 in Funds in PNC Wealth Management Account ending in #8063, $607,074.88 in U.S. Currency in Proceeds from the Sale of Commerical Property located at 10199 Woodfield Lane, St. Louis, MO 63132 and $1,163,000.00 in U.S. Currency in Lieu of 227 Lansing Island Drive, Indian Harbour Beach, FL
Case Number: 4:2022cv01213
Filed: November 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Sarah E Pitlyk
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 981 Forfeiture (Wire Fraud)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2022 Filing 6 MARSHAL Return Executed: party served - Steven Holtshouser. Type of return: Complaint & Notice. (ANP)
December 6, 2022 Filing 5 MARSHAL Return Executed Type of return: Complaint and Notice, (KRZ)
November 22, 2022 Filing 4 MARSHAL Return Executed: party served - $1,000,000 in funds from PNC Wealth Acct. ending in 8063. Type of return: Complaint & Warrant. (ANP)
November 22, 2022 Filing 3 MARSHAL Return Executed: party served - $30,200 US Currency in lieu of 2013 Audi S8 Quattro. Type of return: Complaint & Warrant. (ANP)
November 22, 2022 Filing 2 MARSHAL Return Executed: party served - $607,074.88 in lieu of 10199 Woodfield Lane, St. Louis, MO 63132. Type of return: Complaint & Warrant. (ANP)
November 15, 2022 Forfeiture Warrant Issued as to defendant$1,000,000.00 in Funds in PNC Wealth Management Account ending in #8063, $1,163,000.00 in U.S. Currency in Lieu of 227 Lansing Island Drive, Indian Harbour Beach, FL, $30,200.00 U.S. Currency in lieu of 2013 Audi S8 Quattro, $607,074.88 in U.S. Currency in Proceeds from the Sale of Commerical Property located at 10199 Woodfield Lane, St. Louis, MO 63132. (JBH)
November 15, 2022 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Sarah E. Pitlyk. (JBH)
November 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT of Forfeiture against defendant All Defendants Non-Jury Demand,, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Warrant, #4 Warrant, #5 Warrant, #6 Warrant)(Bateman, Kyle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $30,200.00 U.S. Currency in lieu of 2013 Audi S8 Quattro et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kyle Timothy Bateman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $30,200.00 U.S. Currency in lieu of 2013 Audi S8 Quattro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $1,000,000.00 in Funds in PNC Wealth Management Account ending in #8063
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $607,074.88 in U.S. Currency in Proceeds from the Sale of Commerical Property located at 10199 Woodfield Lane, St. Louis, MO 63132
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $1,163,000.00 in U.S. Currency in Lieu of 227 Lansing Island Drive, Indian Harbour Beach, FL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?