Sineni v. True Value Company
Plaintiff: Andrew Sineni
Defendant: True Value Company
Case Number: 4:2022cv01264
Filed: November 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Patricia L Cohen
Referring Judge: Matthew T Schelp
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Docket Text ORDER: In light of Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, Doc. #22 , the Clerk is directed to close this case. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1) (A)(i). Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 2/13/2023. (BRP)
February 10, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Andrew Sineni Without Prejudice With Each Party to Bear Its Own Costs Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) (Yiatras, Tiffany)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Docket Text ORDER Re: #20 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim by Plaintiff Andrew Sineni; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 1/26/2023. (TMT)
January 25, 2023 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim by Plaintiff Andrew Sineni. (Yiatras, Tiffany)
January 23, 2023 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant True Value Company. (TMT)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Docket Text ORDER Re: #16 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to file overlength brief in support of Defendant's motion to dismiss Complaint by Defendant True Value Company; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 1/23/2023. (TMT)
January 20, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant True Value Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marinucci, Dante)
January 20, 2023 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to file overlength brief in support of Defendant's motion to dismiss Complaint by Defendant True Value Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Complaint)(Marinucci, Dante)
December 27, 2022 Filing 15 CJRA ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, a request has been received for random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above styled cause is randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen to District Judge Matthew T. Schelp. Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Matthew T. Schelp for all further proceedings. (CLT)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Dante A. Marinucci; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 12/21/2022. (LNJ)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Cory N. Barnes; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 12/21/2022. (LNJ)
December 20, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Dante A. Marinucci. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-9683924) by Defendant True Value Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Marinucci, Dante)
December 20, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Cory N. Barnes. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-9683825) by Defendant True Value Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Barnes, Cory)
December 19, 2022 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendants True Value Company, Acon TV Investors, LLC, TV Holdco II, LLC, TV Holdco I, LLC, TV Holdco LLC, TV Cooperative Company.. (Karlsgodt, Paul)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendant True Value Company. (Karlsgodt, Paul); ORDERED GRANTED. True Value Company answer due 1/20/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 12/14/2022. (CLT)
December 13, 2022 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendant True Value Company. (Karlsgodt, Paul)
December 13, 2022 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Paul G. Karlsgodt for Defendant True Value Company. (Karlsgodt, Paul)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Philip J. Krzeski by Plaintiff Andrew Sineni. (Krzeski, Philip), #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Bryan L. Bleichner by Plaintiff Andrew Sineni (Bleichner, Bryan) ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 12/13/22. (JAB)
December 13, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Philip J. Krzeski. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-9670765) by Plaintiff Andrew Sineni. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Attorney Admissions, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Krzeski, Philip)
December 13, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Bryan L. Bleichner. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-9669681) by Plaintiff Andrew Sineni. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Attorney Admissions, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Bleichner, Bryan)
November 28, 2022 Filing 3 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (Potter, Jacob)
November 28, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Andrew Sineni Process Server: Stephen R. Waters of Waterland Litigation Services, LLC (Yiatras, Tiffany)
November 28, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant TRUE VALUE COMPANY with receipt number AMOEDC-9641445, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Andrew Sineni. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form, #3 Summons Summons - True Value Company)(Yiatras, Tiffany)
November 28, 2022 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Patricia L. Cohen. 1 Summons(es) issued and emailed to Attorney Tiffany M. Yiatras. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within 10 days of the filing of the first pleading or entry of appearance # (moed-0001.pdf). (JDC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sineni v. True Value Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Sineni
Represented By: Tiffany M. Yiatras
Represented By: Bryan L. Bleichner
Represented By: Philip Joseph Krzeski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: True Value Company
Represented By: Paul G. Karlsgodt
Represented By: Cory N. Barnes
Represented By: Dante A. Marinucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?