Fidelity National Title Insurance Company v. APM Management Service's, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Fidelity National Title Insurance Company
Defendant: APM MANAGEMENT SERVICES LLC, RICHARD C APPELBAUM, Bank of America, NA, APM Management Service's, LLC, Richard C. Appelbaum, Bank of America, N.A. and Sarah J Appelbaum
Case Number: 4:2022cv01391
Filed: December 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: John A Ross
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1030 Computer Fraud and Abuse Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2023 Filing 84 MOTION to Dismiss :Counts II and VII of the Amended Complaint by Defendants APM Management Service's, LLC, Richard C. Appelbaum. (Martin, James)
February 21, 2023 Filing 83 MOTION to Dismiss :Amended Complaint by Defendant Sarah J Appelbaum. (Martin, James)
February 16, 2023 Filing 82 ENTRY of Appearance by James G. Martin for Defendant Sarah J Appelbaum. (Martin, James)
February 15, 2023 Filing 81 Summons Issued as to defendant Sarah J Appelbaum. The summons was emailed to Jacqueline Graves. (CLT)
February 14, 2023 Filing 80 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Fidelity National Title Insurance Company Process Server: Markell & Associates, Inc. (Graves, Jacqueline)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 79 SECOND AMENDED STIPULATED PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 2/10/2023. (LNJ)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 78 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: This case is assigned to Track: 1. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (Motion to Join Parties due by 3/10/2023. Discovery Completion due by 6/30/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 7/28/2023. Jury Trial set for 12/11/2023 09:00 AM in Courtroom 12N - St. Louis before District Judge John A. Ross. Pretrial Conference set for 11/17/2023 09:00 AM in Courtroom 12N - St. Louis before District Judge John A. Ross.) Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 2/10/2023. (CLT)
February 10, 2023 Filing 77 SUPPLEMENTAL by Plaintiff Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. Supplemental to #76 Amended Complaint, Summons of Sarah Appelbaum. (Graves, Jacqueline) Modified event on 2/13/2023 (CLT).
February 10, 2023 Filing 76 AMENDED COMPLAINT First against defendant All Defendants Amendment to #1 Complaint, First, filed by Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Amended Complaint)(Graves, Jacqueline)
February 10, 2023 Filing 75 Joint MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to Enter Second Amended Stipulated Preliminary Injunction Order without Hearing by Plaintiff Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Second Amended Stipulated Preliminary Injunction)(Graves, Jacqueline)
February 9, 2023 Filing 74 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiff Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. Proposed. (Graves, Jacqueline)
February 6, 2023 Filing 73 ENTRY of Appearance by Timothy J Walsh for Defendant Bank of America, N.A.. (Walsh, Timothy)
February 3, 2023 Filing 72 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant APM Management Service's, LLC. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Martin, James)
February 3, 2023 Filing 71 Electronic Notice of Noncompliance as to Defendant APM Management Service's, LLC. Review of this case shows the Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate has not been filed. The certificate must be filed with the Court within 5 days # (moed-0001.pdf). Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 2/8/2023. (JAB)
January 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT PROPOSED SCHEDULING PLAN: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that all counsel in this matter shall be familiar with the Court's Local Rules and shall read the Administrative Procedures for Case Management/Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF), and the undersigneds Requirements and Federal Practice Tips at www.moed.uscourts.gov. No later than February 10, 2023, counsel shall file with the Clerk of the Court a joint proposed scheduling plan. This case is assigned to Track: 1. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (Joint Scheduling Plan due by 2/10/2023.) Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 1/31/2023. (CLT)
January 30, 2023 Filing 69 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by APM Management Service's, LLC, Richard C. Appelbaum.(Martin, James)
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #67 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendants APM Management Service's, LLC, Richard C. Appelbaum. (Martin, James) ; ORDERED GRANTED. APM Management Service's, LLC answer due 1/30/2023; Richard C. Appelbaum answer due 1/30/2023. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 1/27/23. (JAB)
January 27, 2023 Filing 67 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendants APM Management Service's, LLC, Richard C. Appelbaum. (Martin, James)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #65 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendants Richard C. Appelbaum and APM Management Service's, LLC; attorney/firm Charles S. Kramer, Michael R. Cherba, and Riezman Berger, P.C.; ORDERED GRANTED. (Attorney Charles S. Kramer terminated.) Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 1/25/2023. (LNJ)
January 24, 2023 Filing 65 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendants Richard C. Appelbaum and APM Management Service's, LLC ;attorney/firm Charles S. Kramer, Michael R. Cherba, and Riezman Berger, P.C. by Defendants APM Management Service's, LLC, Richard C. Appelbaum. (Kramer, Charles)
January 24, 2023 Filing 64 ENTRY of Appearance by James G. Martin for Defendants APM Management Service's, LLC, Richard C. Appelbaum. (Martin, James)
January 20, 2023 Filing 63 ENTRY of Appearance by Mark R. Sowers for Plaintiff Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. (Sowers, Mark)
January 20, 2023 Filing 62 REDACTION to doc. #39 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR EXPEDITED DISCOVERY by Fidelity National Title Insurance Company filed by Plaintiff Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Sworn Declaration of John Wait, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Graves, Jacqueline) Modified docket text on 1/23/2023 (LNJ).
January 20, 2023 Filing 61 REDACTION to doc. #44 PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ENTRY OF TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER OR MODIFICATION OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Fidelity National Title Insurance Company filed by Plaintiff Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. (Graves, Jacqueline) Modified docket text on 1/23/2023 (LNJ).
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 60 AMENDED STIPULATED PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER: This matter comes before the Court on Plaintiff Fidelity National Title Insurance Company's ("Plaintiff") Motion for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order or Modification of Preliminary Injunction [Doc. #43 ]. The Court is advised by the parties that: SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 1/19/2023. (CLT)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for leave to conduct expedited discovery, (Doc. No. #48 ), is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for leave to file under seal, (Doc. No. #42 ), is GRANTED. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 1/19/2023. (CLT)
January 19, 2023 Filing 58 Joint MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to Enter Amended Stipulated Order Without Hearing by Plaintiff Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Amended Stipulated Preliminary Injunction Order)(Graves, Jacqueline)
January 19, 2023 Filing 57 Electronic Notice of Noncompliance #38 Sealed Memorandum in Support of Motion,. Review of this case shows that Plaintiff Fidelity National Title Insurance Company filed a Sealed Memorandum in Support of Motion for Leave to File a Document Under Seal but has not yet filed the Redacted Document or Sealed Memo Re: Inability to File Redacted Document, in violation of Local Rule 13.05. You have 3 days to comply with the requirements of Local Rule 13.05 or your sealed document may be stricken from the record. Please refer to the # Guidance on Filing Sealed Materials for Filers.pdf for further instructions. Redacted Copy due by 1/23/2023. (JAB)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the hearing on the motion for temporary restraining order is rescheduled for Monday, January 23, 2023, at 3:30 p.m. in Courtroom 12N, Thomas F. Eagleton Courthouse, 111 South 10th Street, St. Louis, Missouri 63102. This is a time change only. (Motion Hearing set for 1/23/2023 03:30 PM in Courtroom 12N - St. Louis before District Judge John A. Ross.) Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 1/18/2023. (CLT)
January 18, 2023 Filing 55 RESPONSE to Motion re #48 Third MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by Defendant Richard C. Appelbaum. (Kramer, Charles)
January 17, 2023 Filing 54 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion (SEALED) re #42 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal filed by Plaintiff Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. (Graves, Jacqueline)
January 17, 2023 Filing 53 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER re #35 Preliminary Injunction, Bond by Plaintiff Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. (Graves, Jacqueline) cc: Finance Dept. on 1/20/2023 (JAB).
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER: This matter is before the Court on Plaintiff's motion for a temporary restraining order. (Doc. No. #43 ). Plaintiff argues that the temporary restraining order is necessary to protect the diverted funds at issue in this case. Given the importance of the issues and timeliness, the Court will issue an expedited briefing schedule regarding Plaintiffs motion for a temporary restraining order. Accordingly, for good cause shown, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants may file any response to Plaintiff's motion on or before 12:00 p.m. on January 19, 2023. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff may file any reply to Defendants' responses on or before 5:00 p.m. on January 20, 2023. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this matter is set for a hearing on the motion for Monday, January 23, 2023, at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom 12N, Thomas F. Eagleton Courthouse, 111 South 10th Street, St. Louis, Missouri 63102. (Motion Hearing set for 1/23/2023 03:00 PM in Courtroom 12N - St. Louis before District Judge John A. Ross.) Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 1/17/2023. (CLT)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER: This matter is before the Court on Plaintiff's motion for expedited discovery. (Doc. No. #48 ). Plaintiff argues that expedited discovery is necessary to protect the diverted funds at issue in this case. Given the importance of identifying whether or where those funds have been diverted to, the Court will issue an expedited briefing schedule regarding Plaintiff's motion for expedited discovery. Accordingly, for good cause shown, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants may file any response to Plaintiff's motion on or before 5:00 p.m. on January 18, 2023. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff may file any reply to Defendants' responses on or before 5:00 p.m. on January 19, 2023. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 1/17/2023. (CLT)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for leave to conduct expedited discovery, (Doc. No. #29 ), is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Plaintiff may serve its revised requests for production on APM and Appelbaum. (Doc. No. #47 ). APM and Appelbaum shall respond to the requests within seven days, on or before January 20, 2023. IT IS FURHTER ORDERED that the preliminary injunction hearing set for January 17, 2023 is VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for leave to file under seal, (Doc. No. #37 ), is GRANTED. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that the parties shall submit a joint scheduling plan within twenty-one days, on or before February 3, 2023. (Joint Scheduling Plan due by 2/3/2023.) Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 1/13/23. (JAB)
January 13, 2023 Filing 49 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #48 Third MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by Plaintiff Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. (Graves, Jacqueline)
January 13, 2023 Filing 48 Third MOTION to Expedite Discovery by Plaintiff Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Graves, Jacqueline)
January 13, 2023 Filing 47 SUPPLEMENTAL re #29 MOTION to Expedite / MOTION FOR EXPEDITED DISCOVERY by Plaintiff Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. (Graves, Jacqueline)
January 13, 2023 Filing 46 NOTICE by Plaintiff Fidelity National Title Insurance Company re #43 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order or modification of Preliminary Injunction (Graves, Jacqueline)
January 13, 2023 Filing 45 MOTION for Hearing by Plaintiff Fidelity National Title Insurance Company re #43 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order or modification of Preliminary Injunction (Graves, Jacqueline) Modified on 1/17/2023;corrected event from notice to motion (JAB).
January 13, 2023 Filing 44 SEALED MEMORANDUM in Support of #43 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order or modification of Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. (Graves, Jacqueline) Modified text on 1/17/2023 (JAB).
January 13, 2023 Filing 43 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order or modification of Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. (Graves, Jacqueline)
January 13, 2023 Filing 42 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Plaintiff Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. (Graves, Jacqueline)
January 13, 2023 Filing 41 SEALED DECLARATION of John Wait filed by Plaintiff Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Graves, Jacqueline) Modified text on 1/13/2023 (JAB).
January 13, 2023 Filing 40 --DOCUMENT DELETED DUE TO FILING ERROR. DUPLICATE TO DOC #39-- REPLY to Response to Motion re #29 MOTION to Expedite / MOTION FOR EXPEDITED DISCOVERY filed by Plaintiff Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. (Graves, Jacqueline) Modified on 1/13/2023 (JAB).
January 13, 2023 Filing 39 REPLY to Response to Motion re #37 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal filed by Plaintiff Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. (Graves, Jacqueline)
January 13, 2023 Filing 38 SEALED MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #37 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal filed by Plaintiff Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. (Graves, Jacqueline) Modified on 1/13/2023; corrected event (JAB).
January 13, 2023 Filing 37 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Plaintiff Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. (Graves, Jacqueline)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 1/13/23. (JAB)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATED PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER: This matter comes before the Court on Plaintiff Fidelity National Title Insurance Company's (Plaintiff) Motion for Preliminary Injunction [Doc #27 ]. The Court is advised by the parties that: SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 1/13/23. (JAB)
January 12, 2023 Filing 34 RESPONSE in Opposition re #29 MOTION to Expedite / MOTION FOR EXPEDITED DISCOVERY filed by Defendant APM Management Service's, LLC. (Kramer, Charles) (Main Document 34 replaced on 1/13/2023 due to attorney filing error) (JAB).
January 12, 2023 Filing 33 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Proposed Order, Stipulated to by All Parties by Defendant APM Management Service's, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Bank of America, #2 Text of Proposed Order Stipulated Preliminary Injunction Order)(Kramer, Charles)
January 12, 2023 Filing 32 First MOTION for Protective Order Jointly filed by All Parties by Defendant APM Management Service's, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Bank of America, #2 Text of Proposed Order Stipulated Protective Order)(Kramer, Charles)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants may file any response to Plaintiff's motion on or before 5:00 p.m. on January 12, 2023. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff may file any reply to Defendants' responses on or before 12:00 p.m. on January 13, 2023. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this matter is hereby set for a telephone status conference with counsel on Friday, January 13, 2023, at 3:00 p.m. Counsel participating in the telephone conference are directed to call the conference toll free at 1-877-810-9415. The access code to enter the telephone conference for all participants is: 7519116. (Telephone Conference set for 1/13/2023 03:00 PM in Telephone Conference in Chambers before District Judge John A. Ross.) Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 1/11/23. (JAB) Modified on 1/12/2023 (KXS).
January 10, 2023 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #29 MOTION to Expedite / MOTION FOR EXPEDITED DISCOVERY filed by Plaintiff Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. (Wait, John)
January 10, 2023 Filing 29 MOTION to Expedite / MOTION FOR EXPEDITED DISCOVERY by Plaintiff Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Discovery)(Wait, John)
January 10, 2023 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #27 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. (Wait, John)
January 10, 2023 Filing 27 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. (Wait, John)
January 9, 2023 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. Richard C. Appelbaum served on 1/5/2023, answer due 1/26/2023. (Wait, John)
January 9, 2023 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. APM Management Service's, LLC served on 1/5/2023, answer due 1/26/2023. (Wait, John)
January 9, 2023 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. Bank of America, N.A. served on 1/6/2023, answer due 1/27/2023. (Wait, John)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for expedited discovery is GRANTED. Plaintiff may serve its requests for production, as outlined in Exhibit A to (Doc. No. #20 ), on Bank of America. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Bank of America must provide responses to that request for production within three days from the date of service. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 1/6/2023. (LNJ)
January 6, 2023 Filing 22 ENTRY of Appearance by Charles S. Kramer for Defendants APM Management Service's, LLC, Richard C. Appelbaum. (Kramer, Charles)
January 6, 2023 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #20 MOTION to Expedite / MOTION FOR EXPEDITED DISCOVERY filed by Plaintiff Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. (Wait, John)
January 6, 2023 Filing 20 MOTION to Expedite / MOTION FOR EXPEDITED DISCOVERY by Plaintiff Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Discovery)(Wait, John)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that John A Wait's Verified Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (ECF No. 18) is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 1/6/23. (JEB)
January 5, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice John A. Wait. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-9705278) by Plaintiff Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing - J. Wait COGS (New York))(Wait, John)
January 4, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Certification of Dismissal U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York, Case No. 1:22-cv-10649-AKH: by Plaintiff Fidelity National Title Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Attachment Filed Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal)(Graves, Jacqueline)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PRE-HEARING ORDER: A hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction is set for Tuesday, January 17, 2023, at 1:00 p.m. The parties and counsel may join the hearing at zoomgov.com, meeting ID 160 878 4858, password 512702. The general public may listen to the hearing by calling 1-669-254-5252 and entering meeting ID 160 878 4858. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file a separate Motion for Preliminary Injunction no later than Tuesday, January 10, 2023. Defendants shall file a response to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction no later than Friday, January 13, 2023. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel shall, no later than Wednesday, January 11, 2023, file the following with the Clerk of the Court, and submit a paper courtesy copy directly to chambers: (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS.) (remark: copy of this order sent via email to Richard C. Appelbaum on this date.) (Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction set for 1/17/2023 01:00 PM via Zoom Video Conference before District Judge John A. Ross. Response to Court due by 1/11/2023.) Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 1/4/2023. (LNJ)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 BOND ORDER: This Court, having reviewed carefully Plaintiff Fidelity National Title Insurance Company's (Plaintiff) Complaint, Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, and Memorandum in Support of its Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, and having heard argument from Plaintiff's counsel, hereby finds that a bond or security of $500 shall be placed with the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 1/3/23. (JAB) cc: Richard Appelbaum via email.
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER: Accordingly, the the Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order is GRANTED and it is ORDERED as follows: SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 1/3/23. (JAB) cc: Richard Appelbaum via email.
January 3, 2023 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY (no pdf attached) for proceedings held before District Judge John A. Ross: Motion Hearing held on 1/3/2023 via Zoom and in-person re #6 MOTION for Bond filed by Fidelity National Title Insurance Company, #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. Defendants fail to appear. Arguments heard. The Court grants both motions and sets a preliminary injunction hearing for January 17, 2023 at 1:00 pm. Order to follow. (Court Reporter:Lisa Paczkowski, Lisa_Paczkowski@moed.uscourts.gov, 314-244-7985) (proceedings started: 11:30 am) (proceedings ended: 11:55 am) (Deputy Clerk: J.Bernsen)(Appearance for Plaintiff: Jacqueline Graves (via Zoom), John Greenberg (in-person)) (JAB)
January 3, 2023 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by John B. Greenberg for Plaintiff Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. (Greenberg, John)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is set for a hearing on Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (ECF No. #2 ) and Motion for Bond (ECF No. #6 ) today, January 3, 2023, at 11:30 a.m. in Courtroom 12N, Thomas F. Eagleton Courthouse, 111 South 10th Street, St. Louis Missouri 63102. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties and counsel may join the hearing at zoomgov.com, meeting ID 160 878 4858, password 512702. The general public may listen to the hearing by calling 1-669-254-5252 and entering meeting ID 160 878 4858. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall email this notice to Richard C. Appelbaum, on behalf of himself and APM Management Services, LLC at richardappelbaum1018@outlook.com. Dated this 3rd day of January, 2023. (Hearing on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order set for 1/3/2023 11:30 AM in Courtroom 12N - St. Louis before District Judge John A. Ross.) Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 1/3/23. (JAB) cc: Richard C. Appelbaum via email.
January 3, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE Rule 65 Certification: by Plaintiff Fidelity National Title Insurance Company (Graves, Jacqueline)
January 3, 2023 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable John A. Ross. 3 Summons(es) issued and emailed to Attorney Jacqueline Katrina Graves. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within 10 days of the filing of the first pleading or entry of appearance # (moed-0001.pdf). (JDC)
December 30, 2022 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Graves, Jacqueline)
December 30, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Fidelity National Title Insurance Company Process Server: Markell & Associates, Inc. (Graves, Jacqueline)
December 30, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing: by Plaintiff Fidelity National Title Insurance Company re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Graves, Jacqueline)
December 30, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Bond by Plaintiff Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. (Graves, Jacqueline)
December 30, 2022 Filing 5 DECLARATION filed by Plaintiff Fidelity National Title Insurance Company of Rena Lu. (Graves, Jacqueline)
December 30, 2022 Filing 4 DECLARATION filed by Plaintiff Fidelity National Title Insurance Company of Edward J. Hayes. (Graves, Jacqueline)
December 30, 2022 Filing 3 DECLARATION filed by Plaintiff Fidelity National Title Insurance Company of Ginger Dean. (Graves, Jacqueline)
December 30, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Graves, Jacqueline)
December 30, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-9696676, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Original Filing Form, #6 Summons APM Management Service's, LLC, #7 Summons Bank of America, NA, #8 Summons Richard C. Appelbaum)(Graves, Jacqueline)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fidelity National Title Insurance Company v. APM Management Service's, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fidelity National Title Insurance Company
Represented By: Jacqueline Katrina Graves
Represented By: John B. Greenberg
Represented By: John A. Wait
Represented By: Mark R. Sowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APM MANAGEMENT SERVICES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD C APPELBAUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APM Management Service's, LLC
Represented By: Charles S. Kramer
Represented By: James G. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard C. Appelbaum
Represented By: Charles S. Kramer
Represented By: James G. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Timothy J Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah J Appelbaum
Represented By: James G. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?