Porter v. Ludwick
Plaintiff: Mikal R Porter and Mikel R. Porter
Defendant: Unknown Ludwick
Case Number: 4:2023cv00068
Filed: January 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Sarah E Pitlyk
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2023 Filing 5 Letter from Clerk sent to pro-se prisoner re:FRAP - all procedures for filing Notice of Appeal (copy of motion to proceed IFP on appeal attached and mailed) (KEK)
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). IT IS HEREBY CERTIFIED that an appeal would not be taken in good faith. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 3/20/2023. (KEK)
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 4, 5. Mon Mar 20 15:01:49 CDT 2023 (Kratzer, Katie)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to mail to Plaintiff (1) a copy of the Court's prisoner civil rights complaint form and (2) a copy of the application to proceed in district court without prepaying fees or costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff must either pay the $402 filing fee or submit the application to proceed in District Court without prepaying fees or costs within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff must also file a certified account statement. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff must file an amended complaint on the Court-provided form within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that Plaintiff's failure to comply with this Order will result in the dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice. [A COPY OF DIRECTED DOCUMENTS MAILED THIS DATE] Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 2/21/2023. (KEK)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 3. Tue Feb 21 14:11:17 CST 2023 (Kratzer, Katie)
February 13, 2023 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENTAL documents re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Mikel R. Porter. (KRZ)
January 20, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Mikal R Porter. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JDC)
January 20, 2023 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Sarah E. Pitlyk. (JDC)
January 20, 2023 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Fri Jan 20 17:00:44 CST 2023 (admin,)
January 20, 2023 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (JDC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Porter v. Ludwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mikal R Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mikel R. Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Ludwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?