McCauley v. JK Commerce, LLC
Plaintiff: Maryanne McCauley
Defendant: JK Commerce, LLC
Case Number: 4:2023cv00070
Filed: January 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Audrey G Fleissig
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2023 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Maryanne McCauley JK Commerce, LLC waiver signed on 1/23/2023, answer due 3/24/2023. (Schapiro, Douglas)
January 24, 2023 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Audrey G. Fleissig. 1 Summons(es) issued and emailed to Attorney Douglas Schapiro. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within 10 days of the filing of the first pleading or entry of appearance # (moed-0001.pdf). (JDC)
January 23, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Maryanne McCauley Process Server: Pam King Wheetley (Schapiro, Douglas)
January 21, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant JK Commerce, LLC with receipt number AMOEDC-9736765, in the amount of $402 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Maryanne McCauley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Receipt, #2 Exhibit Selfie, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Original Filing Form)(Schapiro, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCauley v. JK Commerce, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maryanne McCauley
Represented By: Douglas Schapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JK Commerce, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?