Bayer CropScience LP et al v. Glass
Plaintiff: Bayer CropScience LP and Monsanto Technology LLC
Defendant: Danny Glass doing business as Glass Farms
Case Number: 4:2023cv00087
Filed: January 25, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Clark
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2023 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Wendell L. Hoskins, II for Defendant Danny Glass. (Hoskins, Wendell)
February 20, 2023 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Danny Glass.(Hoskins, Wendell)
January 31, 2023 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Matthew S. Bober for Plaintiffs Bayer CropScience LP, Monsanto Technology LLC. (Bober, Matthew)
January 31, 2023 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Jeffrey A. Masson for Plaintiffs Bayer CropScience LP, Monsanto Technology LLC. (Masson, Jeffrey)
January 26, 2023 Filing 5 REPORT to Commissioner of filing or determination of an action regarding patent. (JBH)
January 26, 2023 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiffs Monsanto Technology LLC, Bayer AG.. (Cox, Daniel)
January 26, 2023 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiffs Bayer CropScience LP, Bayer AG.. (Cox, Daniel)
January 26, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs Bayer CropScience LP, Monsanto Technology LLC Process Server: McDowell & Associates, LTD (JBH)
January 26, 2023 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Chief U.S. District Judge Stephen R. Clark. 1 Summons(es) issued and emailed to Daniel C. Cox. (JBH)
January 25, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Danny Glass with receipt number AMOEDC-9744467, in the amount of $402 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Bayer CropScience LP, Monsanto Technology LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Patent 945, #2 Exhibit B - Patent 729, #3 Exhibit C - Glass TSA, #4 Exhibit D - 2022 TSA, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Original Filing Form, #7 Summons, #8 Form Notice of Intent to Use Process Server)(Cox, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bayer CropScience LP et al v. Glass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bayer CropScience LP
Represented By: Daniel C. Cox
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Masson
Represented By: Matthew S. Bober
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monsanto Technology LLC
Represented By: Daniel C. Cox
Represented By: Matthew S. Bober
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Glass doing business as Glass Farms
Represented By: Wendell L. Hoskins, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?