Kar et al v. Safeco Insurance Company of America et al
Plaintiff: Arindam Kar and Shanna Kar
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of America and Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2023cv00207
Filed: February 21, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Ronnie L White
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order ***REMARK re. doc. #12 : An authorized filing made through a person's electronic filing account, together with the person's name on a signature block, constitutes the person's signature for all purposes, including Fed.R.Civ.P. 11. This is a courtesy reminder. No correction is necessary unless an order is issued by the Court. (BRP)
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Party Liberty Mutual Insurance Company filed by Plaintiffs Arindam Kar, Shanna Kar. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Korlin, Sheldon)
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Liberty Mutual Insurance Company.. (Carpenter, Christopher)
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of America.. (Carpenter, Christopher)
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Theodore G. Hughes, IV for Plaintiffs Arindam Kar, Shanna Kar. (Hughes, Theodore)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint with Defenses by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America.(Carpenter, Christopher)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Party Liberty Mutual Insurance Company filed by Defendant Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Carpenter, Christopher)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Party Liberty Mutual Insurance Company by Defendant Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Carpenter, Christopher)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: St. Louis City Circuit Court, filed by Arindam Kar, Shanna Kar.(JBH)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUPPLEMENTAL Original Filing Form by Defendants Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Carpenter, Christopher)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America Sent To: Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Carpenter, Christopher)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendants Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc., Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc... (Carpenter, Christopher)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from City of St. Louis, MO, case number 2322-CC00135, with receipt number AMOEDC-9794483, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Carpenter, Christopher)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order ***REMARK Emailed the Defendants attorney and directed them to re-file the disclosure of organizational interests form per defendant on the correct form. (JBH)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Ronnie L. White. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within 10 days of the filing of the first pleading or entry of appearance # (moed-0001.pdf). (JBH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kar et al v. Safeco Insurance Company of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arindam Kar
Represented By: Sheldon D. Korlin
Represented By: Theodore G. Hughes, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shanna Kar
Represented By: Sheldon D. Korlin
Represented By: Theodore G. Hughes, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Christopher J. Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher J. Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?