Collins et al v. Blinken et al
Plaintiff: Kelsey Collins and Joel Roberts
Defendant: Antony Blinken, David L. Cohen, Katherine Brucker and Ana Escrogima
Case Number: 4:2023cv00323
Filed: March 14, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Ronnie L White
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 08 U.S.C. ยง 1329 Writ of Mandamus to Adjudicate Visa Petiti
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: In accordance with Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (ECF No. #5 ), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall make an entry in the docket record reflecting the dismissal of this matter with prejudice. Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i). Each party shall bear its own costs. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on May 8, 2023. (BRP)
May 8, 2023 Filing 5 PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Kelsey Collins, Joel Roberts (Casazza, Christopher)
April 3, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Kelsey Collins, Joel Roberts. Defendant Antony Blinken served on 3/21/2023, answer due 5/22/2023; Katherine Brucker served on 3/21/2023, answer due 5/22/2023; David L. Cohen served on 3/21/2023, answer due 5/22/2023; Ana Escrogima served on 3/21/2023, answer due 5/22/2023. (Casazza, Christopher) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/6/2023: #1 Attachment Summons with Proof of Service) (TMT).
March 15, 2023 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENTAL re 2 Electronic Notice of Filing Deficiency, Summons as to US Attorney General by Plaintiffs Kelsey Collins, Joel Roberts. (Casazza, Christopher)
March 15, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency. In accordance with Eastern District of Missouri Local Rules and the Case Management/Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) Procedures Manual, a filing deficiency has been identified as follows: Completed Summons or Request for Waiver of Service not filed for Attorney General. This deficiency must be filed in the case record immediately. (JDC)
March 15, 2023 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Ronnie L. White. 6 Summons(es) issued and emailed to Attorney Christopher M. Casazza. (JDC)
March 14, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS against defendant Antony Blinken, Katherine Brucker, David L. Cohen, Ana Escrogima with receipt number AMOEDC-9836858, in the amount of $402 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Kelsey Collins, Joel Roberts. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form, #3 Exhibit Exhibits A - H, #4 Summons as to Antony Blinken, #5 Summons as to David L Cohen, #6 Summons as to Katherine Brucker, #7 Summons as to Ana Escrogima, #8 Summons as to US Attorney's Office)(Casazza, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collins et al v. Blinken et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelsey Collins
Represented By: Christopher M. Casazza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Roberts
Represented By: Christopher M. Casazza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antony Blinken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David L. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine Brucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ana Escrogima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?