Pults v. McBee
Petitioner: Lori L Pults
Respondent: Chris McBee
Case Number: 4:2023cv00463
Filed: April 13, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Rodney W Sippel
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2023 Filing 7 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #5 Case Management Order, by Respondent Chris McBee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 DA Transcript, #2 Exhibit 2 DA Motion Transcript, #3 Exhibit 3 DA Transcript, #4 Exhibit 4 DA Motion Transcript, #5 Exhibit 5 DA Trial Transcript Part 1, #6 Exhibit 6 DA Trial Transcript Part 2, #7 Exhibit 7 DA Sentencing Transcript, #8 Exhibit 8 DA Legal File, #9 Exhibit 9 DA Appellant's Appendix, #10 Exhibit 10 DA Appellant's Brief, #11 Exhibit 11 DA Respondent's Brief, #12 Exhibit 12 DA Appellant's Reply Brief, #13 Exhibit 13 DA Opinion, #14 Exhibit 14 DA Docket Sheet, #15 Exhibit 15 PCR Evidentiary Hearing Transcript, #16 Exhibit 16 PCR Legal File, #17 Exhibit 17 PCR Appellant's Appendix, #18 Exhibit 18 PCR Appellant's Brief, #19 Exhibit 19 PCR Respondent's Brief, #20 Exhibit 20 PCR Opinion, #21 Exhibit 21 PCR Docket Sheet)(Spillane, Michael)
May 25, 2023 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael J. Spillane for Respondent Chris McBee. (Spillane, Michael)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 5. Mailed to party not set up for electronic delivery. Fri Apr 21 08:39:26 CDT 2023 (Hutson, Chelsea)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 4 - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following provisions apply in this case, and will be modified only upon a showing of exceptional circumstances: Respondent must show cause, in writing and within forty-five (45) days of the date of this order, why the relief requested in the instant petition should not be granted. (Show Cause Response due by 5/2/2023.) Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 04/18/2023. (KRZ)
April 13, 2023 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Missouri Western; Case Number 4:23-cv-00230. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case transferred in electronically.
April 13, 2023 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Rodney W. Sippel. Per Local Rule 12.01, attorneys who are not admitted to the Eastern District of Missouri do not need to apply for admission pro hac vice in order to practice on a case if they had already filed an entry of appearance before the case was transferred from another United States District Court. For more information, visit #attorney applications. (JWD)
April 13, 2023 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (JWD)
April 13, 2023 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Thu Apr 13 14:01:08 CDT 2023 (admin,)
April 12, 2023 Case electronically transferred to Eastern District of Missouri. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Willis, Kathy)
April 12, 2023 Case electronically transferred to District of Eastern Missouri. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Willis, Kathy)
April 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDERED that Petitioner is granted provisional leave to proceed as a pauper, and this case is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri for all further proceedings. Signed on 4/7/2023 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Willis, Kathy)
April 6, 2023 Filing 2 INMATE FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT filed by Lori L Pults. (Willis, Kathy)
April 6, 2023 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Lori L Pults(Willis, Kathy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pults v. McBee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lori L Pults
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chris McBee
Represented By: Office of Missouri Attorney General - Habeas Division
Represented By: Michael J. Spillane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?