Su v. Mundwiller et al
Plaintiff: Julie A. Su
Defendant: David Mundwiller and Mundwiller Electric LLC doing business as Mundwiller Electric
Case Number: 4:2023cv01161
Filed: September 15, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Matthew T Schelp
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CONSENT ORDER AND JUDGMENT: [SEE JUDGMENT FOR COMPLETE DETAILS] Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 10/5/2023. (TMT)
October 2, 2023 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Elizabeth Anne Johnson for Defendants Mundwiller Electric LLC, David Mundwiller. (Johnson, Elizabeth) Modified on 10/3/2023 (BRP).
September 21, 2023 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Julie A. Su David Mundwiller waiver signed on 9/18/2023, answer due 11/17/2023. (Flores, Kim)
September 21, 2023 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Julie A. Su Mundwiller Electric LLC waiver signed on 9/18/2023, answer due 11/17/2023. (Flores, Kim)
September 19, 2023 Filing 4 FINAL NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #1 Complaint. The filing deficiency previously identified has not been corrected by the filing attorney. Case to proceed to judge assignment and further review by the Clerks Office Exec. Team. (JWD)
September 19, 2023 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Matthew T. Schelp. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible. # (moed-0001.pdf). (JWD)
September 18, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #1 Complaint. In accordance with Eastern District of Missouri Local Rules and the Case Management/Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) Procedures Manual, a filing deficiency has been identified as follows: Notice of Process Server and Completed Summons or Request for Waiver of Service not filed. This deficiency must be filed in the case record immediately. (JWD)
September 18, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Settlement by Plaintiff Julie A. Su. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Consent Order and Judgment, #2 Attachment EXECUTED Consent Order and Judgment)(Flores, Kim)
September 18, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Julie A. Su. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form)(Flores, Kim)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Su v. Mundwiller et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie A. Su
Represented By: Kim Prichard Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Mundwiller
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mundwiller Electric LLC doing business as Mundwiller Electric
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?