Downs v. Snyder et al
Plaintiff: Kim Downs
Defendant: Larry Snyder, Donnie Volentine, Scott Brown and Doug Compton
Case Number: 4:2024cv00618
Filed: May 2, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Welby
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Docket Text ORDER: Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint #10 is GRANTED. No later than July 29, 2024, Plaintiff must file an amended complaint. So Ordered by Judge Stephen R. Welby on 06/28/24. (MCC)
June 27, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to and Additional Time to File and Amended Petitioni by Plaintiff Kim Downs. (Jimerson, Herman)
June 27, 2024 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Herman L. Jimerson for Plaintiff Kim Downs. (Jimerson, Herman)
June 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - This matter comes before the Court on Plaintiff Kim Down's Motion for Extension of Time (ECF No. #7 ). The motion is GRANTED. The deadline for Plaintiff to show cause why this matter should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction is extended to July 5, 2024. (Show Cause Response due by 7/5/2024.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen R. Welby on 6/10/24. (KJS)
June 10, 2024 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 8. Mon Jun 10 10:18:51 CDT 2024 (Shirley, Kelley)
June 7, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #5 Order to Show Cause, by Plaintiff Kim Downs. (CLT)
May 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. (See Full Order.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Kim Downs is required to show cause in writing and within thirty (30) days of the date of this Memorandum and Order why this action should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that failure to comply with this order will result in the dismissal of this case without prejudice and without further notice. (Show Cause Response due by 6/12/2024.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen R. Welby on 5/13/2024. (CBL)
May 13, 2024 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 5. Order sent to party not electronically notified this date. Mon May 13 09:28:52 CDT 2024 (Long, Carol)
May 2, 2024 Filing 6 Receipt: $ 405.00, receipt number 20588 Civil Filing Fee- Non-Prisoner on behalf of Kim Downs (CCAM). (auto)
May 2, 2024 Filing 4 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (auto)
May 2, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Kim Downs Process Server: Pedro (JWD)[Clerk's note: plaintiff did not sign document]
May 2, 2024 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kim Downs. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (JWD)
May 2, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Scott Brown, Doug Compton, Larry Snyder, Donnie Volentine, in the amount of $405.00 receipt number STL-20588, Jury Demand, filed by Kim Downs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Mechanic's Lean Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form, #4 Summons Snyder, #5 Summons Volentine, #6 Summons Brown, #7 Summons Compton)(JWD)
May 2, 2024 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (JWD)
May 2, 2024 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Thu May 2 14:01:45 CDT 2024 (admin,)
May 2, 2024 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Stephen R. Welby. 4 Summons(es) issued and hand delivered to plaintiff Kim Downs. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible. # (moed-0001.pdf). (JWD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Downs v. Snyder et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Downs
Represented By: Herman L. Jimerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donnie Volentine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Compton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?