Johnson v. Valvoline, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Cathy Johnson
Defendant: Valvoline, Inc., Valvoline Instant Oil Change Franchising, Inc., Team Car Care East, LLC, Jiffy Lube International, Inc. and Valvoline, LLC doing business as Valvoline Instant Oil Change
Case Number: 4:2024cv00972
Filed: July 15, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: John A Ross
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1132 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2024 Filing 32 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs Punitive Damage Pleading and Plaintiffs Impertinent and Immaterial Pleadings by Defendants Jiffy Lube International, Inc., Team Car Care East, LLC. (Buchanan, David)
August 14, 2024 Filing 31 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Valvoline, LLC, Valvoline US, LLC.. (Radetic, Edward)
August 14, 2024 Filing 30 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Valvoline Instant Oil Change Franchising, Inc., Valvoline US, LLC.. (Radetic, Edward)
August 14, 2024 Filing 29 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Valvoline, Inc., BlackRock, Inc... (Radetic, Edward)
August 8, 2024 Filing 28 Electronic Notice re: Disclosure Statement to Defendants Valvoline Instant Oil Change Franchising, Inc., Valvoline, Inc., Valvoline, LLC. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible and add all individuals and entities into CM/ECF as required # (moed-0001.pdf). (JAB)
August 2, 2024 Filing 27 MOTION for Oral Argument: by Defendants Valvoline Instant Oil Change Franchising, Inc., Valvoline, Inc., Valvoline, LLC re #8 MOTION to Strike, #7 MOTION to Strike (Radetic, Edward) Modified docket text and event type on 8/5/2024 (LNJ).
August 2, 2024 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #8 MOTION to Strike, #7 MOTION to Strike and Reply to Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition filed by Defendants Valvoline Instant Oil Change Franchising, Inc., Valvoline, Inc., Valvoline, LLC. (Radetic, Edward)
August 1, 2024 Filing 25 Joint ANSWER to #19 Amended Complaint, by Jiffy Lube International, Inc., Team Car Care East, LLC.(Buchanan, David)
August 1, 2024 Filing 24 ANSWER to #19 Amended Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by Valvoline Instant Oil Change Franchising, Inc., Valvoline, Inc., Valvoline, LLC.(Radetic, Edward)
July 29, 2024 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Strike, #16 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs Punitive Damage Pleading and Plaintiffs Impertinent and Immaterial Pleadings, #7 MOTION to Strike filed by Plaintiff Cathy Johnson. (Emanuel, Ambry)
July 25, 2024 Filing 22 AMENDED DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Team Car Care East, LLC, Team Car Care East, Inc, Team Car Care West, Inc . (Buchanan, David) Modified on 7/25/2024 (ANR).
July 25, 2024 Filing 21 AMENDED DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jiffy Lube International, Inc., Pennzoil-Quaker State Company.. (Buchanan, David)
July 23, 2024 Filing 20 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #17 Disclosure Statement, #18 Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Jiffy Lube International, Inc., Team Car Care East, LLC. In accordance with Eastern District of Missouri Local Rules and the Case Management/Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) Procedures Manual, a filing deficiency has been identified as follows: Party filed the Disclosure Statement in this action in which jurisdiction is based on diversity but failed to properly complete the Court adopted form. In addition to completing section 1 of the form, non-individuals must include the state of incorporation/formation and state of primary business practice in Section 2 (See FRCP 7.1). LLCs, LLPs must include all members, sub-members, general and limited partners, and corporations and his/her/its state of citizenship (see above) in Section 2. These entities must be entered into CM/ECF where prompted. An amended Disclosure Statement must be filed immediately, using the Court adopted form. # (moed-0001.pdf). (CBL)
July 23, 2024 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant Jiffy Lube International, Inc., Team Car Care East, LLC, Valvoline Instant Oil Change Franchising, Inc., Valvoline, Inc., Valvoline, LLC,Terminating Ashland Oil, Inc. and Ashland, LLC Amendment to 14 Electronic Notice - Leave to File Amended Document yes demand, , filed by Cathy Johnson. Related document: 14 Electronic Notice - Leave to File Amended Document.(Emanuel, Ambry)
July 22, 2024 Filing 18 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jiffy Lube International, Inc., Pennzoil-Quaker State Company.. (Buchanan, David)
July 22, 2024 Filing 17 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Team Car Care East, LLC. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Buchanan, David)
July 22, 2024 Filing 16 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs Punitive Damage Pleading and Plaintiffs Impertinent and Immaterial Pleadings by Defendants Jiffy Lube International, Inc., Team Car Care East, LLC. (Buchanan, David)
July 22, 2024 Filing 15 Joint ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) filed by Defendants Jiffy Lube International, Inc., Team Car Care East, LLC. (Buchanan, David)
July 22, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE: The Court has granted the motion for leave to file an amended document re #12 . Therefore, counsel should now file a clean copy of the amended document in CM/ECF. (JAB)
July 22, 2024 Filing 13 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #12 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct To Add, Drop and/or Change Parties by Plaintiff Cathy Johnson (Emanuel, Ambry) ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by Sr. District Judge John A. Ross on 7/22/24. (JAB)
July 22, 2024 Filing 12 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct To Add, Drop and/or Change Parties by Plaintiff Cathy Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint)(Emanuel, Ambry)
July 19, 2024 Filing 11 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Petition by Consent re #5 Petition (Removal/Transfer) by Defendants Ashland Oil, Inc., Ashland, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(JWD) filed by Ashland Oil, Inc., Ashland, LLC; ORDERED GRANTED. (Ashland Oil, Inc. answer due 7/22/2024; Ashland, LLC answer due 7/22/2024.) Signed by Sr. District Judge John A. Ross on 7/19/24. (JAB)
July 17, 2024 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cathy Johnson. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Emanuel, Ambry)
July 16, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Petition by Consent re #5 Petition (Removal/Transfer) by Defendants Ashland Oil, Inc., Ashland, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(JWD)
July 16, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Impertinent and Immaterial Pleadings by Defendants Valvoline Instant Oil Change Franchising, Inc., Valvoline, Inc., Valvoline, LLC. (JWD)
July 16, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Punitive Damage Pleading by Defendants Valvoline Instant Oil Change Franchising, Inc., Valvoline, Inc., Valvoline, LLC. (JWD)
July 16, 2024 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) #5 Petition (Removal/Transfer) filed by Defendants Valvoline Instant Oil Change Franchising, Inc., Valvoline, Inc., Valvoline, LLC. (JWD)
July 16, 2024 Filing 5 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: St. Louis County Circuit Court, filed by Cathy Johnson.(JWD)
July 16, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Jiffy Lube International, Inc., Team Car Care East, LLC Sent To: Plaintiff (JWD)
July 16, 2024 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENTAL Exhibit A to Notice of Removal by Defendants Jiffy Lube International, Inc., Team Car Care East, LLC. (Buchanan, David)
July 16, 2024 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable John A. Ross. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible. # (moed-0001.pdf). (JWD)
July 15, 2024 Filing 2 Consent to Removal by Defendants Ashland Oil, Inc., Ashland, LLC, Valvoline Instant Oil Change Franchising, Inc., Valvoline, Inc., Valvoline, LLC (d/b/a Valvoline Instant Oil Change). (Buchanan, David)
July 15, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of St. Louis County, case number 24SL-CC02549, with receipt number AMOEDC-10711792, in the amount of $405 Jury Demand,, filed by Jiffy Lube International, Inc., Team Car Care East, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Original Filing Form)(Buchanan, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Valvoline, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valvoline, Inc.
Represented By: Edward John Radetic, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valvoline Instant Oil Change Franchising, Inc.
Represented By: Edward John Radetic, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Team Car Care East, LLC
Represented By: David R. Buchanan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jiffy Lube International, Inc.
Represented By: David R. Buchanan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valvoline, LLC doing business as Valvoline Instant Oil Change
Represented By: Edward John Radetic, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy Johnson
Represented By: Ambry Nichole Emanuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?