Anderson et al v. AFC Transportation, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Dora Young and Levi Anderson
Defendant: John Does 1 to 20 inclusive, Fox Freight, Inc., Shariff Osman and AFC Transportation, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2024cv01061
Filed: July 31, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Matthew T Schelp
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2024 Filing 26 CLERK'S ORDER (NMG) - The above styled and numbered case was opened on July 31, 2024. Due to a clerical error, the case was randomly assigned as a case number from the Eastern Division. The case should have been filed in the Southeastern Division. Accordingly, the above-styled case is transferred to the Southeastern Division and assigned to the Honorable Matthew T. Schelp, United States District Judge, under cause number 1:24CV00172 MTS. Case number 4:24CV01061 MTS shall be administratively closed. (JWD)
September 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS] No later than Wednesday, October 02, 2024, Plaintiffs shall file an amended complaint establishing that this Court has subject matter jurisdiction over this action. See 28 U.S.C. 1653; Harper v. Marshall Ford Sales, Inc., 366 F. App'x 721, 722 (8th Cir. 2010) (per curiam) (finding district court should have provided plaintiff "notice or an opportunity to amend" before dismissing case for lack of subject matter jurisdiction). The failure to do so will result in dismissal of this action without prejudice. (Amended/Supplemental Pleadings due by 10/2/2024.) Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 9/18/2024. (TMT)
September 5, 2024 Filing 24 AMENDED DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Fox Freight, Inc.. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Klotz, Craig)
August 28, 2024 Filing 23 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Shariff Osman. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Klotz, Craig)
August 28, 2024 Filing 22 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Fox Freight, Inc.. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Klotz, Craig)
August 28, 2024 Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Shariff Osman.(Klotz, Craig)
August 28, 2024 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Fox Freight, Inc..(Klotz, Craig)
August 28, 2024 Filing 19 ENTRY of Appearance by Craig Klotz for Defendants Fox Freight, Inc., Shariff Osman. (Klotz, Craig)
August 27, 2024 Filing 18 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AFC Transportation, Inc.. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Klotz, Craig)
August 27, 2024 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by AFC Transportation, Inc..(Klotz, Craig)
August 27, 2024 Filing 16 ENTRY of Appearance by Craig Klotz for Defendant AFC Transportation, Inc.. (Klotz, Craig)
August 15, 2024 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Levi Anderson, Dora Young. Fox Freight, Inc. served on 8/7/2024, answer due 8/28/2024. (Green, Michael)
August 14, 2024 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Levi Anderson, Dora Young. Shariff Osman served on 8/7/2024, answer due 8/28/2024. (Green, Michael)
August 13, 2024 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Levi Anderson, Dora Young. AFC Transportation, Inc. served on 8/6/2024, answer due 8/27/2024. (Green, Michael)
August 1, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs Levi Anderson, Dora Young Process Server: JANNEY & JANNEY (Green, Michael)
August 1, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs Levi Anderson, Dora Young Process Server: JANNEY & JANNEY (Green, Michael)
August 1, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs Levi Anderson, Dora Young Process Server: JANNEY & JANNEY (Green, Michael)
August 1, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency. In accordance with Eastern District of Missouri Local Rules and the Case Management/Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) Procedures Manual, a filing deficiency has been identified as follows: Notice of Process Server form not filed. This deficiency must be filed in the case record immediately. (JBH)
August 1, 2024 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Matthew T. Schelp. 3 Summons(es) issued and emailed to Michael P. Green. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible. # (moed-0001.pdf). (JBH)
July 31, 2024 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENTAL by Plaintiffs LEVI ANDERSON, DORA YOUNG (Green, Michael) Modified on 8/1/2024 to correct docket text (JBH).
July 31, 2024 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENTAL by Plaintiffs LEVI ANDERSON, DORA YOUNG (Green, Michael) Modified on 8/1/2024 to correct docket text (JBH).
July 31, 2024 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENTAL by Plaintiffs LEVI ANDERSON, DORA YOUNG (Green, Michael) Modified on 8/1/2024 to correct docket text (JBH).
July 31, 2024 Filing 5 COMPLAINT ORIGINAL FILING FORM against defendant All Defendants Jury Demand,, filed by LEVI ANDERSON, DORA YOUNG.(Green, Michael)
July 31, 2024 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by DORA YOUNG. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Green, Michael)
July 31, 2024 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by LEVI ANDERSON. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Green, Michael)
July 31, 2024 Filing 2 COMPLAINT CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET against defendant All Defendants Jury Demand,, filed by LEVI ANDERSON, DORA YOUNG.(Green, Michael)
July 31, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-10742197, in the amount of $405 Jury Demand,, filed by LEVI ANDERSON.(Green, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson et al v. AFC Transportation, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1 to 20 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fox Freight, Inc.
Represented By: Craig Klotz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shariff Osman
Represented By: Craig Klotz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AFC Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Craig Klotz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dora Young
Represented By: Michael P. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Levi Anderson
Represented By: Michael P. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?