Edwards v. Lippman
Plaintiff: Veta Edwards
Defendant: Brent Lippman
Case Number: 4:2024cv01094
Filed: August 8, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Sarah E Pitlyk
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RULE 16 ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 2 Joint Scheduling Plan due by 10/28/2024. Rule 16 Conference set for 11/18/2024 11:00 AM in Chambers before District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk. [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS]. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 8/28/2024. (NEP)
August 9, 2024 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Brendon T. Sanders for Defendant Brent Lippman. (Sanders, Brendon)
August 8, 2024 Filing 7 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: St. Charles County Circuit Court, filed by Veta Edwards.(JWD)
August 8, 2024 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Samuel Kai Rebmann for Defendant Brent Lippman. (Rebmann, Samuel)
August 8, 2024 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Brent Lippman. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Kinder, Jacqueline)
August 8, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Brent Lippman Sent To: Plaintiff (Kinder, Jacqueline)
August 8, 2024 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) filed by Defendant Brent Lippman. (Kinder, Jacqueline)
August 8, 2024 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Jacqueline M. Kinder for Defendant Brent Lippman. (Kinder, Jacqueline)
August 8, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of St. Charles County, case number 2411-CC00660, with receipt number BMOEDC-10755788, in the amount of $405 Jury Demand,, filed by Brent Lippman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F)(Kinder, Jacqueline)
August 8, 2024 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Sarah E. Pitlyk. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible. # (moed-0001.pdf). (JWD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards v. Lippman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veta Edwards
Represented By: Brady McAninch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent Lippman
Represented By: Samuel Kai Rebmann
Represented By: Jacqueline M. Kinder
Represented By: Brendon T. Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?