Niedas-Aguilar v. Mahan et al
Plaintiff: Manuel Niedas-Aguilar
Defendant: Cynthia Mahan and WEL Companies, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2024cv01118
Filed: August 14, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Rodney H Holmes
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2024 Filing 15 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Manuel Niedas-Aguilar. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Moffitt, John)
October 11, 2024 Filing 14 Electronic Notice re: Disclosure Statement to Plaintiff Manuel Niedas-Aguilar. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible and add all individuals and entities into CM/ECF as required # (moed-0001.pdf). (JEB)
October 10, 2024 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cynthia Mahan. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Fritz, Kevin)
October 10, 2024 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint Defendant's Answer and Affirmative Defenses by Cynthia Mahan.(Fritz, Kevin)
October 10, 2024 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Kevin L. Fritz for Defendant Cynthia Mahan. (Fritz, Kevin)
August 15, 2024 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Cynthia Mahan Cynthia Mahan waiver signed on 8/14/2024, answer due 10/15/2024. (Wells, Alexandra)
August 14, 2024 Filing 9 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (auto)
August 14, 2024 Filing 8 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: St. Louis County Circuit Court, filed by Manuel Niedas-Aguilar.(JWD)
August 14, 2024 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Petition by WEL Companies, Inc..(Fritz, Kevin)
August 14, 2024 Filing 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendant WEL Companies, Inc.. (Fritz, Kevin)
August 14, 2024 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by WEL Companies, Inc.. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Fritz, Kevin)
August 14, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant WEL Companies, Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Fritz, Kevin)
August 14, 2024 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Kevin L. Fritz for Defendant WEL Companies, Inc.. (Fritz, Kevin)
August 14, 2024 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Alexandra Carolyn Wells for Defendant WEL Companies, Inc.. (Wells, Alexandra)
August 14, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis City Circuit Court, case number 2422-CC04061, with receipt number AMOEDC-10766088, in the amount of $405 Jury Demand,, filed by WEL Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - All Docket Entries, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form)(Fritz, Kevin)
August 14, 2024 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Rodney H. Holmes. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible. # (moed-0001.pdf). (JWD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Niedas-Aguilar v. Mahan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Mahan
Represented By: Kevin L. Fritz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEL Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Alexandra Carolyn Wells
Represented By: Kevin L. Fritz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Niedas-Aguilar
Represented By: John Healy Moffitt, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?