Long v. Rogers
Plaintiff: Wayne Long
Defendant: Brian J. Rogers
Case Number: 4:2024cv01144
Filed: August 22, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Matthew T Schelp
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: two [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS].( Motion to Join Parties due by 12/16/2024. Discovery Completion due by 7/31/2025. Non-Dispositive Motions due by 8/7/2025. ADR Future Reference 5/27/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 7/31/2025. Jury Trial set for 11/3/2025 08:30 AM in Courtroom 16S - St. Louis before District Judge Matthew T. Schelp.). Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 10/01/2024. (KCD)
October 1, 2024 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY (no pdf attached) for proceedings held before District Judge Matthew T. Schelp:Rule 16 Conference held on 10/1/2024. Conference held in person. CMO to issue. (proceedings started: 1:12 pm) (proceedings ended: 1:19 pm) (Appearance for Plaintiff: Derek Thrasher)(Appearance for Defendant: John Rahoy) (TMT)
September 27, 2024 Filing 15 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiff Wayne Long. . (Thrasher, Derek)
September 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RULE 16 ORDER: This case is assigned to Track: Track 2 (Standard) [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS] (Joint Scheduling Plan due by 9/27/2024. Rule 16 Conference set for 10/1/2024 01:00 PM in Courtroom 16S - St. Louis before District Judge Matthew T. Schelp.) Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 9/17/2024. (TMT)
September 9, 2024 Filing 13 AMENDED DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wayne Long. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Nissenholtz, Todd)
September 9, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #10 Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff Wayne Long. In accordance with Eastern District of Missouri Local Rules and the Case Management/Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) Procedures Manual, a filing deficiency has been identified as follows: : Party filed the Disclosure Statement in this action in which jurisdiction is based on diversity but failed to properly complete the Court adopted form with diversity information. Individual parties must list their name and state of citizenship (Do not list residence or domicile) in Section 2. An amended Disclosure Statement must be filed immediately, using the Court adopted form. # (moed-0001.pdf). (CBL)
September 6, 2024 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Todd R. Nissenholtz for Plaintiff Wayne Long. (Nissenholtz, Todd)
September 6, 2024 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wayne Long. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Nissenholtz, Todd)
August 23, 2024 Filing 8 AMENDED DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Brian J. Rogers. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Rahoy, John)
August 23, 2024 Filing 7 Electronic Notice re: Disclosure Statement to Plaintiff Wayne Long. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible and add all individuals and entities into CM/ECF as required # (moed-0001.pdf). (TMT)
August 22, 2024 Filing 9 Electronic Notice - Application for Admission needed as to Derek S. Thrasher. Review of case shows that Attorney Derek S. Thrasher is not currently a member of our Bar. For instructions on applying for bar admission or moving for pro hac vice admission, please follow the instructions located on our website at #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov under the Attorney tab. Notice only, no.pdf attached. (CBL)
August 22, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Brian J. Rogers Sent To: Plaintiff (JWD)
August 22, 2024 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) #4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) filed by Defendant Brian J. Rogers. (JWD)
August 22, 2024 Filing 4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: St. Louis County Circuit Court, filed by Wayne Long.(JWD)
August 22, 2024 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Brian J Rogers. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Rahoy, John)
August 22, 2024 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by John P. Rahoy for Plaintiff Brian J Rogers. (Rahoy, John)
August 22, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St Louis County, case number 24SL-CC02075, with receipt number AMOEDC-10781487, in the amount of $405 Jury Demand,, filed by Brian J Rogers. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form, #3 Form Disclosure Statement, #4 Exhibit St County Docket Sheet, #5 Exhibit Petition, #6 Exhibit Return of Service of Summons, #7 Exhibit Entry of Appearance of Derek Thrasher for Plaintiff, #8 Exhibit Entry of Appearance John Rahoy for Brian Rogers, #9 Exhibit Answer of Brian Rogers, #10 Exhibit Notice of Removal To Plaintiff, #11 Exhibit Notice of Removal to State Court - Unexecuted)(Rahoy, John) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/22/2024 due to fillable PDF error) (JWD). Modified on 8/22/2024 (JWD).
August 22, 2024 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Matthew T. Schelp. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible. # (moed-0001.pdf). (JWD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Long v. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Long
Represented By: Todd R. Nissenholtz
Represented By: Derek S. Thrasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian J. Rogers
Represented By: John P. Rahoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?