Flores et al v. Reynolds
Plaintiff: Celeste Flores and Scarlett Romero
Defendant: Evan Reynolds
Case Number: 4:2024cv01147
Filed: August 22, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Clark
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2024 Filing 21 Electronic Notice Re: 20 Notice (Other) filed by Plaintiff Celeste Flores. Counsel are reminded that discovery documents are not accepted by the Court. See Rule 3.02 (FRCP 26) Filing of Discovery and Disclosure Materials:(A) In civil actions, discovery and disclosure materials pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 26, 30, 31, 33, 34, 35, and 36, and the certificates of their service, shall not be filed with the Court except as exhibits to a motion or memorandum. (TLR)
September 30, 2024 Filing 20 --DOCUMENT DELETED PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 3.02-- NOTICE Compliance for Plaintiffs Rule 26 Disclosures: by Plaintiffs Celeste Flores, Scarlett Romero (Atterbury, Tony) (Deleted document - discovery documents not accepted by the Court Local Rule 3.02 (FRCP 26)) Modified on 10/1/2024 (TLR).
September 27, 2024 Filing 19 Docket Text ORDER: The Court orders the parties to review and comply with the undersigned's Judge's Requirements, located on the Eastern District of Missouri's court website: #Chief Judge Stephen R. Clark's Requirements. The undersigned periodically updates his Judge's Requirements, and the parties must ensure that they are complying with the most recent version before filing any document. Failure to comply with the requirements may result in the imposition of "sanction[s] or other disadvantage." Fed. R. Civ. P. 83(b). Signed by Chief District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 9/27/24. (JAB)
September 26, 2024 Filing 18 ENTRY of Appearance by Zachary Kurtz Zygmund for Defendant Evan Reynolds. (Zygmund, Zachary)
September 23, 2024 Filing 17 Docket Text ORDER: The Court continues the Rule 16 scheduling conference to October 24, 2024, at 4:00 p.m. in Courtroom 14-North. (Rule 16 Conference set for 10/24/2024 04:00 PM in Courtroom 14N - St. Louis before Chief District Judge Stephen R. Clark.) Signed by Chief District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 9/23/24. (JAB)
September 17, 2024 Filing 16 AMENDED DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Scarlett Romero. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Atterbury, Tony)
September 17, 2024 Filing 15 AMENDED DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Celeste Flores. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Atterbury, Tony)
September 17, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #12 Disclosure Statement, #13 Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiffs Celeste Flores, Scarlett Romero. In accordance with Eastern District of Missouri Local Rules and the Case Management/Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) Procedures Manual, a filing deficiency has been identified as follows: Please fill out and file the Court-provided Disclosure Statement (MOED-0001), which can be found on the Court's website under the Forms section. An amended Disclosure Statement must be filed for each plaintiff. (ANR)
September 16, 2024 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Scarlett Romero. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Baumberger, Michael)
September 16, 2024 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Celeste Flores. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Baumberger, Michael)
September 16, 2024 Filing 11 Electronic Notice re: Disclosure Statement to Plaintiffs Celeste Flores, Scarlett Romero. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible and add all individuals and entities into CM/ECF as required # (moed-0001.pdf). (LNJ)
September 12, 2024 Filing 10 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Defendant Evan Reynolds. . (Boyce, Sarah)
September 10, 2024 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Tony L. Atterbury for Plaintiffs Celeste Flores, Scarlett Romero. (Atterbury, Tony)
August 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CONFERENCE: Pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, a scheduling conference is set for September 25, 2024, at 4:00 p.m. CT in Courtroom 14-North. Lead trial counsel must appear in person at the conference. Joint Scheduling Plan due by 9/16/2024. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (Rule 16 Conference set for 9/25/2024 04:00 PM in Courtroom 14N - St. Louis before Chief District Judge Stephen R. Clark.) Signed by Chief District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 8/27/2024. (KXS)
August 23, 2024 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Evan Reynolds. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Boyce, Sarah)
August 22, 2024 Filing 6 Electronic Notice - Application for Admission needed as to Michael L. Baumberger. Review of case shows that Attorney Michael L. Baumberger is not currently a member of our Bar. For instructions on applying for bar admission or moving for pro hac vice admission, please follow the instructions located on our website at #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov under the Attorney tab. Notice only, no.pdf attached. (JBH)
August 22, 2024 Filing 5 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis County, filed by Scarlett Romero.(JBH)
August 22, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Evan Reynolds Sent To: Plaintiff (JBH)
August 22, 2024 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Evan Reynolds.(Boyce, Sarah)
August 22, 2024 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Sarah M. Boyce for Defendant Evan Reynolds. (Boyce, Sarah)
August 22, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis County, case number 24SL-CC02229, with receipt number AMOEDC-10782355, in the amount of $405 Jury Demand,, filed by Evan Reynolds. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Petition Filed in State Court, #2 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Attachment Original Filing Form, #4 Attachment Docket Sheet and Filings, #5 Attachment Notice of Filing Notice of Removal to Plaintiffs)(Boyce, Sarah)
August 22, 2024 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Chief U.S. District Judge Stephen R. Clark. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible. # (moed-0001.pdf). (JBH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flores et al v. Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Celeste Flores
Represented By: Michael L. Baumberger
Represented By: Tony L. Atterbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scarlett Romero
Represented By: Michael L. Baumberger
Represented By: Tony L. Atterbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evan Reynolds
Represented By: Sarah M. Boyce
Represented By: Zachary Kurtz Zygmund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?